Hillebrandt et al v. Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Charles Hillebrandt, Jessica Hillebrandt, Nolan Hillebrandt, Charlene Stehlik and Frederick Stehlik
Defendant: Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. and Yorkwind Crawford
Case Number: 4:2023cv03067
Filed: April 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1364 Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew R. Chouinard on behalf of Defendants Yorkwind Crawford, Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. (Chouinard, Matthew)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A planning conference is set for June 16, 2023 at 9:00 AM by telephone before the undersigned magistrate judge. The parties should use the case conference instructions assigned to this case to participate. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TMM)
June 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PROTECTIVE ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order, (Filing No. #12 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Daniel F. Church on behalf of Defendants Yorkwind Crawford, Critical Supply Solutions, Inc..(Church, Daniel)
June 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Brittain E. McClurg on behalf of Defendants Yorkwind Crawford, Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. (McClurg, Brittain)
June 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting email motion to extend. The parties shall file the Rule 26(f) report on or before June 12, 2023.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TMM)
May 3, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Carrie K. Gaines on behalf of Defendant Critical Supply Solutions, Inc..(Gaines, Carrie)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
May 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 5/29/2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO)
April 28, 2023 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. (Church, Daniel)
April 21, 2023 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Yorkwind Crawford. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
April 21, 2023 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(TCL)
April 21, 2023 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
April 21, 2023 Filing 2 DECLARATION by Attorney Daniel F. Church on behalf of Defendants Yorkwind Crawford, Critical Supply Solutions, Inc..(Church, Daniel)
April 21, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4848035) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Daniel F. Church on behalf of Critical Supply Solutions, Inc., Yorkwind Crawford (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Church, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillebrandt et al v. Critical Supply Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hillebrandt
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Hillebrandt
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolan Hillebrandt
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Stehlik
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Stehlik
Represented By: Jeffrey P. Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Critical Supply Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Carrie K. Gaines
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Represented By: Carrie K Gaines
Represented By: Matthew R. Chouinard
Represented By: Brittain E. McClurg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yorkwind Crawford
Represented By: Carrie K. Gaines
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Represented By: Carrie K Gaines
Represented By: Matthew R. Chouinard
Represented By: Brittain E. McClurg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?