Chisano v. Newton et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Chisano
Defendant: John Newton, John Doe 1, John Doe 2, John Doe 3 and John Doe 4
Case Number: 4:2023cv03133
Filed: July 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay Proceedings by Attorney Josiah Shanks on behalf of Defendant John Newton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion)(Shanks, Josiah)
August 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Attorney. Tiernan T. Siems is withdrawn as counsel for Plaintiff and shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CEW)
August 28, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave , MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Tiernan T. Siems on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Chisano.(Siems, Tiernan)
August 28, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Chloe L. Kuehner on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Chisano (Kuehner, Chloe)
August 28, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Notice of Appearance #6 is stricken for the following reason: the document is a duplicate of document number #5 . Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (ADB)
August 28, 2023 Filing 6 STRICKEN - NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ryan M. Kunhart on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Chisano (Kunhart, Ryan) Modified on 8/28/2023 to strike per order 7 (ADB).
August 25, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Ryan M. Kunhart on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Chisano (Kunhart, Ryan)
August 17, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Josiah Shanks on behalf of Defendant John Newton (Shanks, Josiah)
August 16, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney David J. Skalka on behalf of Defendant John Newton (Skalka, David)
July 21, 2023 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL)
July 21, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4905266), by Attorney Tiernan T. Siems on behalf of Anthony Chisano (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Siems, Tiernan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chisano v. Newton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Chisano
Represented By: Tiernan T. Siems
Represented By: Chloe L. Kuehner
Represented By: Ryan M. Kunhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Newton
Represented By: David J. Skalka
Represented By: Josiah Shanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?