Rithm Capital Corp. v. Choice Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Rithm Capital Corp.
Defendant: Choice Management, LLC doing business as Rhythm Financial Group
Counter Claimant: Choice Management, LLC
Case Number: 4:2023cv03218
Filed: November 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/9/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRM)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESTRICTED TELEPHONE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
January 9, 2024 Filing 19 REPLY to Counterclaim by Rithm Capital Corp. (Novak, Mary Ann)
December 19, 2023 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Alexander Arkfeld on behalf of Defendant Choice Management, LLC.(Arkfeld, Alexander)
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand , COUNTERCLAIM with jury demand against Rithm Capital Corp. regarding Complaint #1 filed by Rithm Capital Corp. by Choice Management, LLC (Arkfeld, Alexander)
December 8, 2023 Filing 16 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Choice Management, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
December 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by December 19, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney David C. Mullin on behalf of Defendant Choice Management, LLC.(Mullin, David)
December 4, 2023 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #12 for attorney Ritika Bhakhri. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
December 4, 2023 Filing 12 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4987554 by Attorney Ritika Bhakhri on behalf of Plaintiff Rithm Capital Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bhakhri, Ritika)
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #10 for attorney Benjamin M. Stern. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
November 29, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-4984363 by Attorney Benjamin M. Stern on behalf of Plaintiff Rithm Capital Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Stern, Benjamin)
November 27, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Choice Management, LLC on 11/21/2023. (Novak, Mary Ann)
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Ritika Bhakhri has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Benjamin M. Stern has not registered for admittance to practice nor registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
November 17, 2023 Filing 6 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding a trademark number. Complaint filed on 11/16/2023. Notification sent to the U.S. Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (LRM)
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Choice Management, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
November 16, 2023 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Mary Ann Novak on behalf of Plaintiff Rithm Capital Corp..(Novak, Mary Ann)
November 16, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Choice Management, LLC d/b/a Rhythm Financial Group regarding Complaint #1 . (Novak, Mary Ann)
November 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Choice Management, LLC, d/b/a Rhythm Financial Group ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4977923), by Attorney Mary Ann Novak on behalf of Rithm Capital Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Novak, Mary Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rithm Capital Corp. v. Choice Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rithm Capital Corp.
Represented By: Mary Ann Novak
Represented By: Benjamin M. Stern
Represented By: Ritika Bhakhri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choice Management, LLC doing business as Rhythm Financial Group
Represented By: Alexander Arkfeld
Represented By: David C. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Choice Management, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Arkfeld
Represented By: David C. Mullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?