Cole v. Centerpointe et al
Plaintiff: Miranda L. Cole
Defendant: Centerpointe, Centerpointe Campus for Hope, LLC., Kurt Lockard, Amy Borchers and Nicole Osborne
Case Number: 4:2023cv03228
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Family Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2023 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 for CenterPointe by Attorney Charles E. Wilbrand on behalf of Defendant Centerpointe.(Wilbrand, Charles)
December 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Centerpointe Campus for Hope, LLC. terminated. Ordered by Senior Judge John M. Gerrard. (DCD)
December 7, 2023 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION to Dismiss Party CenterPointe Campus for Hope, LLC by Attorney John Cartier on behalf of Plaintiff Miranda L. Cole.(Cartier, John)
December 7, 2023 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Centerpointe Campus for Hope, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
December 7, 2023 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Centerpointe. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (KMM)
December 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Thomas Joseph Helget on behalf of Defendants Amy Borchers, Centerpointe, Centerpointe Campus for Hope, LLC., Kurt Lockard, Nicole Osborne (Helget, Thomas)
December 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Charles E. Wilbrand on behalf of Defendants Amy Borchers, Centerpointe, Centerpointe Campus for Hope, LLC., Kurt Lockard, Nicole Osborne (Wilbrand, Charles)
December 6, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Nicole Osborne. Waiver sent on 12/6/2023. (Wilbrand, Charles)
December 6, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Centerpointe Campus for Hope, LLC.. Waiver sent on 12/6/2023. (Wilbrand, Charles)
December 6, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Kurt Lockard. Waiver sent on 12/6/2023. (Wilbrand, Charles)
December 6, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon CenterPointe defendant Centerpointe. Waiver sent on 12/6/2023. (Wilbrand, Charles)
December 6, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Amy Borchers defendant Amy Borchers. Waiver sent on 12/6/2023. (Wilbrand, Charles)
November 28, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendants Amy Borchers, Centerpointe, Centerpointe Campus for Hope, LLC., Kurt Lockard, Nicole Osborne. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
November 28, 2023 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to CenterPointe, CenterPointe Campus for Hope LLC., Kurt Lockard, Amy Borchers, Nicole Osborne regarding Complaint, #1 . (Cartier, John)
November 28, 2023 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
November 28, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4983549), by Attorney John Cartier on behalf of Miranda LeAnne Cole (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Cartier, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Centerpointe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda L. Cole
Represented By: John Cartier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerpointe
Represented By: Charles E. Wilbrand
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Helget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerpointe Campus for Hope, LLC.
Represented By: Charles E. Wilbrand
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Helget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Lockard
Represented By: Charles E. Wilbrand
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Helget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Borchers
Represented By: Charles E. Wilbrand
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Helget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole Osborne
Represented By: Charles E. Wilbrand
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Helget
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?