Rushman v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Rushman
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company, Railcrew Xpress, LLC and Sergio Tinajero
Case Number: 4:2024cv03051
Filed: March 6, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline M DeLuca
Nature of Suit: Federal Employer's Liability
Cause of Action: 45 U.S.C. ยง 51 Railways: Fed. Employer's Liability Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 AMENDED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LRM)
April 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER: Defendant BNSF Railway Company and Defendant Railcrew Xpress, LLC filed a joint Third-Party Complaint #15 . Accordingly, the Rule 26(f) Report deadline is stayed and will be reset following the filing of a responsive pleading to the Third-Party Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (KLM)
April 12, 2024 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to defendant Sergio Tinajero. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
April 12, 2024 Filing 17 Summons Requested as to Sergio Tinajero regarding Summons Requested #16 . (Knight, Chad)
April 11, 2024 Filing 16 Summons Requested as to Sergio Tinajero regarding Third Party Complaint #15 . (Knight, Chad)
April 11, 2024 Filing 15 JOINT THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Sergio Tinajero, by Attorney Chad M. Knight on behalf of BNSF Railway Company(Knight, Chad)
April 8, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Joshua N. Miller on behalf of Plaintiff Anthony Rushman (Miller, Joshua)
April 4, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Richard M. Tomich on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company (Tomich, Richard)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LRM)
April 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 5/2/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (LRM)
April 2, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Chad M. Knight on behalf of Defendant BNSF Railway Company.(Knight, Chad)
April 2, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by BNSF Railway Company (Knight, Chad)
March 28, 2024 Filing 8 Defendant RCXs ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Railcrew Xpress, LLC (Church, Daniel)
March 13, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant BNSF Railway Company on 3/12/2024. (Banker, Paul)
March 13, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Railcrew Xpress, LLC on 3/7/2024. (Banker, Paul)
March 6, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendants BNSF Railway Company, Railcrew Xpress, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
March 6, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 6, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Requested as to Railcrew Xpress regarding Complaint, #1 . (Banker, Paul)
March 6, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to BNSF Railway Company regarding Complaint, #1 . (Banker, Paul)
March 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against BNSF Railway Company, Railcrew Xpress, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5044988), by Attorney Paul A. Banker on behalf of Anthony Rushman (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Banker, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rushman v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Rushman
Represented By: Paul A. Banker
Represented By: Joshua N. Miller
Represented By: Randal W. LeNeave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Represented By: Chad M. Knight
Represented By: Richard M. Tomich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Railcrew Xpress, LLC
Represented By: Daniel F. Church
Represented By: Matthew R. Chouinard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Tinajero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?