American Foods Group, LLC et al v. Irsik Equities, LP et al
Plaintiff: American Foods Group, LLC and Gibbon Packing, LLC
Defendant: Irsik Equities, LP a Kansas partnership doing business as Irsik Family Partnership and Lambrecht Livestock Trucking, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv03060
Filed: March 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
2 Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335 Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Case Dismissal Without Prejudice by Attorney Adam J. Prochaska on behalf of Plaintiffs American Foods Group, LLC, Gibbon Packing, LLC (Prochaska, Adam)
April 10, 2024 Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed pursuant to the filing of a Notice of Case Dismissal. (ADB)
April 9, 2024 Filing 22 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate American Foods Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Rosen's Diversified, Inc. for Gibbon Packing, LLC. by Attorney Adam J. Prochaska on behalf of Plaintiffs Gibbon Packing, LLC, American Foods Group, LLC, Rosen's Diversified, Inc..(Prochaska, Adam)
April 9, 2024 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Rosen's Diversified, Inc., Other Affiliate RDI Shareholder, LLC for American Foods Group, LLC. by Attorney Adam J. Prochaska on behalf of Plaintiffs American Foods Group, LLC, Rosen's Diversified, Inc., RDI Shareholder, LLC.(Prochaska, Adam)
April 9, 2024 Filing 20 AMENDED COMPLAINT with with jury demand against Defendant Irsik Equities, LP, by Attorney Adam J. Prochaska on behalf of Gibbon Packing, LLC, American Foods Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Prochaska, Adam)
April 8, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Christopher R. Hedican on behalf of Defendant Lambrecht Livestock Trucking, Inc. (Hedican, Christopher)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW DOCUMENTS: Plaintiffs' Motion to Withdraw Without Prejudice Plaintiffs' Motion Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Expedited Consideration, Filing 16, is granted. Plaintiffs' Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and Request for Oral Argument, Filing 2, and Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, Filing 3, are deemed withdrawn without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (ADB)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON JURISDICTIONAL ISSUES: Defendants shall have to and including April 22, 2024, to file an appropriate motion and supporting brief, either jointly or separately, concerning jurisdictional issues and any other Rule 12(b) grounds for dismissal; Plaintiffs' counsel shall have to and including May 13, 2024, to file a brief in opposition or response; and Defendants shall have to and including May 27, 2024, to file any reply. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (ADB)
April 1, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw Document regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and Request for Oral Argument #2 and Motion for Expedited Consideration without prejudice by Attorney Mark A. Fahleson on behalf of Plaintiffs American Foods Group, LLC, Gibbon Packing, LLC.(Fahleson, Mark)
April 1, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Randall K. Rathbun on behalf of Defendant Irsik Equities, LP (Rathbun, Randall)
March 29, 2024 Filing 14 TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian C. Buescher Motion Hearing held on 3/29/2024 regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and Request for Oral Argument #2 , MOTION Expedited Consideration regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and Request for Oral Argument #2 #3 Appearances made on the record. Argument by parties. Deadlines set forth on the record. Matter is held in abeyance pending filings discussed on the record. Hearing will be continued by further order of the court. Hearing held via telephone. Courtroom Deputy: Tracy McKibben; Reporter: Rogene Schroder ; Appearance for Plaintiff: Mark Fahleson, Adam Prochaska, : Appearance for Defendant: Randall Rathbun for Irsik Equities, LP; Chris Headican for Lambrecht Livestock Trucking, Inc. Time Start: 3:16 p.m.; Time Stop: 3:54 p.m.; Time in Court: 38 minutes. (TJM)
March 29, 2024 Filing 13 INDEX in support of MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and Request for Oral Argument #2 by Attorney Mark A. Fahleson on behalf of Plaintiffs American Foods Group, LLC, Gibbon Packing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Roger Dudley, DVM, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Mark Fahleson, #3 Affidavit Affidavit of Ashley Lembke, PhD)(Fahleson, Mark)
March 29, 2024 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #11 for attorney Randall K. Rathbun. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO)
March 29, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ANEDC-5059379 by Attorney Randall K. Rathbun on behalf of Defendant Irsik Equities, LP.(Rathbun, Randall)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESTRICTED HEARING INSTRUCTIONS AND ORDER. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (E-mailed to Randy Rathbun)(TJM)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING VIDEO HEARING ON MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER : MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #2 is set for 3/29/2024 at 02:30 PM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Judge Brian C. Buescher. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (ADB)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - In light of judicial economy, this case is reassigned to District Judge Brian C. Buescher for disposition and remains assigned to Magistrate Michael D. Nelson for judicial supervision. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (ADB)
March 28, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Service by Attorney Mark A. Fahleson on behalf of Plaintiffs American Foods Group, LLC, Gibbon Packing, LLC (Fahleson, Mark)
March 28, 2024 Filing 6 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Gibbon Packing, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 28, 2024 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff American Foods Group, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 28, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 28, 2024 Filing 3 MOTION Expedited Consideration regarding MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and Request for Oral Argument #2 by Attorney Mark A. Fahleson on behalf of Plaintiffs American Foods Group, LLC, Gibbon Packing, LLC.(Fahleson, Mark)
March 28, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, and Request for Oral Argument by Attorney Mark A. Fahleson on behalf of Plaintiffs American Foods Group, LLC, Gibbon Packing, LLC.(Fahleson, Mark)
March 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand for Interpleader, injunction, and damages against Irsik Equities, LP d/b/a Irsik Family Partnership, Lambrecht Livestock Trucking, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5058563), by Attorney Mark A. Fahleson on behalf of Gibbon Packing, LLC, American Foods Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Quarantine Order, #2 Exhibit Livestock Certificate, #3 Exhibit Bill of Sale)(Fahleson, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Foods Group, LLC et al v. Irsik Equities, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Foods Group, LLC
Represented By: Adam J. Prochaska
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gibbon Packing, LLC
Represented By: Adam J. Prochaska
Represented By: Mark A. Fahleson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irsik Equities, LP a Kansas partnership doing business as Irsik Family Partnership
Represented By: Randall K. Rathbun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lambrecht Livestock Trucking, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher R. Hedican
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?