January 27, 2011 |
Filing
107
ORDER granting 106 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. This action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
|
September 2, 2010 |
Filing
105
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that a settlement conference shall be held before the undersigned with counsel and representatives of the parties on October 4, 2010 beginning at 9:00 a.m. in chambers, 566 Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 100 Cente nnial Mall North, Lincoln, Nebraska. The parties' representatives and/or counsel shall be prepared to participate and negotiate a settlement of this case during the conference. The trial of this case, currently set for October 4, 2010, is continued to February 22, 2011. The pretrial conference, currently scheduled for September 13, 2010, is continued and will be re-scheduled if this case is not settled during the settlement conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (ADB, )
|
June 18, 2010 |
Filing
103
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 92 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 102 Motion to Strike. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
|
May 21, 2010 |
Filing
99
ORDER regarding MOTION for Summary Judgment 92 that plaintiffs are granted leave to file a sur-reply brief that addresses the merits of the Nebraska Defendants sovereign immunity argument. The sur-reply brief shall be filed on or before June 7, 2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
|
March 31, 2010 |
Filing
90
ORDER granting 88 Motion to Amend Progression Order. The deadline to file motions to dismiss or motions for summary judgment on grounds other than qualified immunity is April 16, 2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE)
|
March 30, 2010 |
Filing
89
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 48 the Nebraska Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment based on qualified immunity; granting in part and denying in part 52 the Wyoming Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment based on qualified immunity. Irons, Woodard and Vickers are terminated as parties in this action. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
|
March 5, 2010 |
Filing
78
PROTECTIVE ORDER Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing
75
ORDER granting 72 Motion to Extend The discovery and deposition deadline, and the deadline to file motions to dismiss, motions for summary judgment on grounds other than qualified immunity, and motions to exclude expert testimony on Daubert and related grounds is extended to March 31, 2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
|
December 1, 2009 |
Filing
45
ORDER - Upon the agreement of the parties, (filing no. 44 ), defendants' deadline for disclosure of experts is hereby continued until December 21, 2009. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
|
July 2, 2009 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - In Magistrate Judge Piester's absence and with the agreement of Judge Piester and Judge Strom the undersigned has begun handling all magistrate judge matters previously handled by Judge Piester in this case. 1) The plannin g conference scheduled before Magistrate Judge Piester on 7/24/09 is cancelled. 2) On or before 7/24/09 the parties shall jointly file a motion setting forth their proposed deadlines for continued progression of this case to trial. The motion shall i nclude a proposed deadline for filing summary judgment motions based on qualified immunity, for completion of discovery, and for disclosing experts and their reports, and shall include a statement of when this case will be ready for trial as ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (SED)
|
May 19, 2009 |
Filing
28
ORDER regarding 26 Motion for Leave. Following a telephone conference with counsel this date, IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiff's motion for leave to file amended complaint, filing no. 26 , is granted and the amended complaint shall be filed forthwit h. The Rule 16 telephone planning conference is continued to July 24, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. Central Time. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. The deadline for filing summary judgment motions based on qualified immunity will be extended at the July 24, 2009 telephone conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKH)
|
December 12, 2008 |
Filing
19
ORDER regarding 18 Motion to Extend. IT IS ORDERED: The stipulated motion of the parties, filing 18, is granted and the deadline for filing the parties' Rule 26(f) planning conference report is extended to January 16, 2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKH)
|