Lopez v. Dascal
Plaintiff: Hilda Lopez
Defendant: Ioan Dascal
Case Number: 7:2009cv05003
Filed: May 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 7 North Platte Office
County: Kimball
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 44 Stipulation for Dismissal. The parties' stipulation (Filing No. 44 ) is granted. The complaint and the counterclaims are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JAB)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 AMENDED ORDER on or before 5/12/2010 the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Magistrate Judge Thalken a draft order which will fully dispose of the case; absent co mpliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice; the pretrial conference scheduled for 5/14/2010 is cancelled upon the representation this case is settled; the jury trial scheduled for 6/1/2010 in North Platte, Nebraska is cancelled upon the representation this case is settled as ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (SED)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Motion to Continue. The Pretrial Conference is rescheduled for 5/14/2010 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
January 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting 28 Stipulation for Dismissal. This case is dismissed with prejudice as to the following plaintiffs: (1) Hilda Lopez; (2) ElsaFernandez; and (3) Maida Lopez and Antonio Lopez-Guerrero, Sr., as the natural parents of Antonio Lopez-Guerrero, Jr. a minor. The individual claims of Maida Lopez and Antonio Lopez-Guerrero, Sr. against Ioan Dascal remain pending. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
January 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The defendant shall have to on or before January 21, 2010, to respond to the Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall amend the docket and case caption to reflect parties remaining in the Second Amended Complaint.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that the plaintiffs shall have until 1/15/2010 to show cause why the Second Amended Complaint should not be stricken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken for final disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - The telephone planning conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is continued to December 1, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. Central Standard Time. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephone conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez v. Dascal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Lopez
Represented By: Cletus W. Blakeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ioan Dascal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?