Lehman v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: David E. Lehman
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2009cv05007
Filed: August 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 7 North Platte Office
County: Dawes
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf (REFERRAL JUDGE)
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 86 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the parties' joint stipulation for dismissal with prejudice (filing 85 ) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay its own costs. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 83 SETTLEMENT ORDER. It is ordered that: (1)Within thirty (30) calendar days of the date of this order, the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) with the clerk of the court (and provide a copy to the m agistrate judge and to United States District Judge Richard G. Kopf, the trial judge to whom this case is assigned), together with submitting to the trial judge a draft order which will fully dispose of the case;(2)Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice;(3)This case is removed from the court's February 16, 2010 trial docket upon representation by the parties that the case has settled. ***Set Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 2/19/2010.Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLL, )
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 68 Defendant's Motion to Quash. On or before January 18, 2010, the defendant shall produce: 1) any Safety Team Notes which may exist that discuss Julie Lehman's accident of July 21 , 2009 at the defendant's store in Chadron, Nebraska; and 2) any code white documents which may exist for a seizure incident occurring near the pharmacy on July 21, 2009, but only to the extent they indicate the time frame of the pharmacy incident, and with any identifying and medical information concerning the Wal-Mart customer who had the seizure redacted. In all other respects, the defendant's motion to quash, (filing no. 68 ), isgranted. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Except as to defendant's objections to paragraphs 6 through 9 of the plaintiff's 30(b)(6) notice, as limited in scope by the court's reasoning herein, the defendant's motion to quash, filing no. 27 , is gra nted. To the extent the defendant has not objected, or the court has limited but not quashed a 30(b)(6) deposition topic in response to defendant's objections, the plaintiff remains entitled to depose corporate representatives pursuant to the pr eviously served Rule 30(b)(6) notice, provided such depositions are held in Bentonville, Arkansas, or other mutually agreed upon location. To avoid future scheduling problems, the parties shall meet and confer, and the remaining portions of the Rule 30(b) (6) deposition shall be re-noticed by the plaintiff for a date, time, and place mutually agreeable to counsel for both parties and the witnesses. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (GJG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehman v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Jerald L. Ostdiek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Lehman
Represented By: Monte L. Neilan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?