Shivvers v. Vande Kamp Trucking, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Taj D. Shivvers |
Defendant: |
Vande Kamp Trucking, Inc. and Cecil L. Schlampp |
Case Number: |
7:2012cv05003 |
Filed: |
April 11, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
7 North Platte Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Lyle E. Strom |
Presiding Judge: |
F.A. Gossett |
Nature of Suit: |
P.I.: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 12, 2013 |
Filing
39
ORDER, that having been advised by the parties that the above matters have been settled by mediation, the parties shall have until May 24, 2013, to file the dismissal documents. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
|
January 17, 2013 |
Filing
31
ORDER - The parties shall have until April 12, 2013, to report on the outcome of mediation, which is currently scheduled for March 25, 2013. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
|
January 7, 2013 |
Filing
30
ORDER granting (26) Motion to Compel in case 7:12-cv-05003-LES-FG3; granting (22) Motion to Compel in case 8:12-cv-00138-LES-FG3. Plaintiffs shall respond to all Interrogatories and Requests for Production served upon them by defendants by no lat er than January 22, 2013. Plaintiffs shall make themselves available for a deposition in the state of Nebraska on a date convenient to both parties, but all depositions must be completed on or before February 4, 2013. Plaintiffs shall schedule a medi ation with a mutually-agreed-upon mediator so that mediation can commence no later than February 12, 2013. The Court will consider attorneys fees upon further briefing and evidence provided by the parties. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
September 12, 2012 |
Filing
24
ORDER that this matter is before the Court after a planningconference was held with counsel. The parties shall conduct initial discovery, including written discovery and depositions, necessary to attempt mediation, said discovery and mediation to be completed on or before February 4, 2013. The parties shall file a written status report with the Court, on or before February 22, 2013, as to the progress of mediation, or the need to schedule further case progression deadlines. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB)
|
August 13, 2012 |
Filing
23
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2012 08:15 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
|
April 30, 2012 |
Filing
5
ORDER - The Motion for Leave to Withdraw (filing 3 ) is granted. The Clerk shall terminate the appearance of Maren Chaloupka as Plaintiff's counsel and terminate future notices to Maren Chaloupka in this matter. This case will be stay ed until May 28, 2012, to provide Plaintiff time to obtain new counsel. By or before May 28, 2012, Plaintiff shall have new counsel enter an appearance or, alternatively, advise the court that he wishes to proceed pro se. Maren Chaloupka shall provide a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?