Harris News Agency, Inc. v. Bowers

Petitioner: Harris News Agency, Inc.
Respondent: William L. Bowers
Case Number: 7:2013cv05012
Filed: November 27, 2013
Court: Nebraska District Court
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Richard G. Kopf
Referring Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:925 Firearm
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2016 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - that Petitioner's motion for attorney's fees (Filing No. 53 ) is granted in part and denied in part, as follows: Petitioner's request for attorney's fees under the Gun Control Act, 18 U.S.C. § 924(d)(2 )(B), is denied. Petitioner's request for attorney's fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), is granted to the limited extent that Petitioner is awarded the sum of $23,185.98 for attorney's fees and expenses for all proceedings before this court and the Court of Appeals. In all other respects, Petitioner's motion is denied. Judgment shall be entered by separate document. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (KLF)
March 21, 2016 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - The parties' joint motion to amend judgment (filing 51 ) is granted, and that the judgment entered on March 3, 2016 (filing 50 ), is amended to read as follows: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to the direction of the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, summary judgment is entered for Petitioner and against Respondent, and Respondent's denial of Petitioner's Federal Firearms License application is set aside and held for naught. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
October 3, 2014 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (BHC)
July 14, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' joint motion to continue, (Filing No. 25 ), is granted as follows: The parties' cross-motions for summary judgment shall be filed by August 25, 2014. Responsive briefs be filed by September 24, 2014. No reply briefs shall be filed without leave of the court for good cause shown. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (TCL )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris News Agency, Inc. v. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William L. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Harris News Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Scott L. Braum
Represented By: Patrick M. Heng
Represented By: Timothy R. Rudd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?