Goddard v. Castle

Plaintiff: Connie M Goddard, G. Christopher Goddard and Luke Goddard
Defendant: Ronnie F Castle
Case Number: 7:2014cv05004
Filed: May 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: John M. Gerrard
Presiding Judge: Cheryl R. Zwart
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying 83 motion for costs and attorney fees; denying 90 motion for disgorgement of corporate funds. Ordered by Judge John M. Gerrard. (CCB)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER - A settlement conference will be held before the undersigned magistrate judge with counsel and the parties on June 9, 2017, beginning at 1:00 p.m. at the Waite, McWha Law Firm, 116 North Dewey St., North Platte, Nebraska. The parties shall be prepared to participate and negotiate a settlement of this case during the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that the Defendant is given until October 13, 2016 to show cause why the court should not enter a default and/or default judgment against Defendant without further notice. The clerk shall mail a copy of this order to Defendant at his address of record. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the motion to withdraw filed by David W. Pederson, as counsel of record for Defendant Ronnie F. Castle (Filing No. 62 ) and the motion to amend the motion to withdraw (Filing No. 63 ), are granted. On or before September 16, 2016, Defendant Ronnie F. Castle shall either: (a) obtain the services of counsel and have that attorney file an appearance in this case; or (b) file a statement notifying the court of his intent to litigate this case without the assistance of co unsel. The failure to do so may result in an entry of default and/or default judgment against Defendant Ronnie F. Castle. David W. Pederson shall promptly mail a copy of this order to Defendant, and file a certificate of service stating the date and the manner of service, and the name and address served. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC)
November 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Joint Motion to Continue. 1) The parties' joint motion, (Filing No. 28 ), is granted, and the telephonic conference scheduled for December 2, 2014 is cancelled. 2) If this case is not fully resolved by summary judg ment, the parties shall:a. Serve their mandatory disclosures within 21 days following the court's ruling on the dispositive motions; and b. Schedule a conference call with the undersigned magistrate judge to discuss further case progression deadlines, such call to be held no later than 30 days following the summary judgment rulings. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JAB)
July 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Strike. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KMG)
June 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot 5 Motion to Strike allegations within the plaintiff's initial complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JSF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goddard v. Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie F Castle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connie M Goddard
Represented By: R. Kevin O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Christopher Goddard
Represented By: R. Kevin O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Goddard
Represented By: R. Kevin O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?