Garcia v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Angel D. Garcia
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Case Number: 7:2016cv05000
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 7 North Platte Office
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER AND JUDGMENT regarding Memorandum Opinion, 20 . The final decision of the Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration is affirmed. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that plaintiff's application for extension of time is granted; plaintiff shall have until August 8, 2016, to file her brief. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (LAC)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. This action shall be filed at no cost to plaintiff pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(1). Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel D. Garcia
Represented By: Thomas A. Krause
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administration
Represented By: Office of General Counsel Social Security Administ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?