Wilmeth v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois

Plaintiff: Blaine C. Wilmeth
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Case Number: 7:2019cv05006
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 7/25/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LAC)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Change Place of Trial by Attorney Bruce A. Moothart on behalf of Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois.(Moothart, Bruce)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent Safeco Insurance Company of America, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc. for Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. by Attorney Bruce A. Moothart on behalf of Defendants Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois, Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Safeco Corporation, Safeco Insurance Company of America.(Moothart, Bruce)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois (Moothart, Bruce)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois on 5/28/2019. (Woody, Ryan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Ryan L. Woody on behalf of Plaintiff Blaine C. Wilmeth.(Woody, Ryan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to defendant Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois regarding Complaint #1 . (Woody, Ryan)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3943449), by Attorney Ryan L. Woody on behalf of Blaine C. Wilmeth(Woody, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmeth v. Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blaine C. Wilmeth
Represented By: Blaine T. Gillette
Represented By: Ryan L. Woody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company of Illinois
Represented By: Bruce A. Moothart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?