Gompert v. Coxbill Company et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas D Gompert
Defendant: Coxbill Company and Cole Coxbill
Case Number: 7:2019cv05007
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Susan M Bazis
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 7/1/20. Pretrial Conference set for 11/16/2020 at 10:00 AM Internet/Telephonic Conferencing before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Telephone Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 03:00 PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The parties did not consent, in writing, to disposition of the case by a magistrate judge. Pursuant to NEGenR.1.4(a)(3)(C)(ii). Case reassigned to Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (ADB)
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Todd R. McWha on behalf of Defendants Cole Coxbill, Coxbill Company.(McWha, Todd)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/19/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER denying as moot #3 Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue. Defendants request that this action be transferred to North Platte, Nebraska. However, this case is already assigned to the North Platte docket. Accordingly, Defendants' motion is denied as moot. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Katy A. Reichert has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
June 20, 2019 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNED: Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
June 19, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Todd R. McWha on behalf of Defendant Coxbill Company.(McWha, Todd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Change Venue by Attorney Todd R. McWha on behalf of Defendants Cole Coxbill, Coxbill Company.(McWha, Todd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 and Request for Trial in North Platte by Cole Coxbill, Coxbill Company (McWha, Todd)
June 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand against Nicholas D Gompert from Scotts Bluff County District Court, Case number 19-262 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-3962484) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Todd R. McWha on behalf of Coxbill Company(McWha, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gompert v. Coxbill Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas D Gompert
Represented By: Katy A. Reichert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coxbill Company
Represented By: Todd R. McWha
Represented By: Margaret R. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cole Coxbill
Represented By: Todd R. McWha
Represented By: Margaret R. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?