Arana v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Cecilia Arana
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America and Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 7:2019cv05013
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting #14 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to January 24, 2020, to file a response to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #9 #11 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
January 8, 2020 Filing 14 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading to Motions to Dismiss by Attorney Erin E. Schroeder on behalf of Plaintiff Cecilia Arana.(Schroeder, Erin)
December 27, 2019 Filing 13 INDEX in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #11 by Attorney Kathryn E. Jones on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit A)(Jones, Kathryn)
December 27, 2019 Filing 12 BRIEF in support of MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM #11 by Attorney Kathryn E. Jones on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc..(Jones, Kathryn)
December 27, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Attorney Kathryn E. Jones on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc..(Jones, Kathryn)
December 27, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #9 by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Davidson, Steven)
December 27, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America.(Davidson, Steven)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Unum Group for Unum Life Insurance Company of America. by Attorney Steven D. Davidson on behalf of Defendants Unum Life Insurance Company of America, Unum Group.(Davidson, Steven)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Marcia A. Washkuhn on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc..(Washkuhn, Marcia)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall have an extension of time to December 27, 2019, to file answers or other responsive pleadings to the Complaint. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (SMN)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Marcia A. Washkuhn on behalf of Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc..(Washkuhn, Marcia)
November 20, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Tyson Foods, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(KLF)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Unum Life Insurance Company of America. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(KLF)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Senior Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (KLF)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Joint) against All Plaintiffs from District Court of Dawson County, Nebraska, Case number CI 19-379 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4060780) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Marcia A. Washkuhn on behalf of Tyson Foods, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Errata C)(Washkuhn, Marcia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arana v. Unum Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Steven D. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Marcia A. Washkuhn
Represented By: Kathryn E. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia Arana
Represented By: Erin E. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?