Ramirez v. Menard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Albert Ramirez
Defendant: Menard, Inc. and Menard, Inc. a Nebraska Corporation doing business as Menards
Case Number: 7:2020cv05006
Filed: July 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: John M Gerrard
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION to Remand by Attorney Nathan J. Kinport on behalf of Plaintiff Albert Ramirez. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Remand)(Kinport, Nathan)
August 24, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Todd R. McWha on behalf of Defendant Menard, Inc..(McWha, Todd)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Attorney Nathan J. Kinport on behalf of Plaintiff Albert Ramirez.(Kinport, Nathan)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 8/28/2020. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LKO)
July 28, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Todd R. McWha on behalf of Defendant Menard, Inc..(McWha, Todd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 and Request for Place of Trial by Menard, Inc. (McWha, Todd)
July 28, 2020 Filing 3 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Nathan J. Kinport has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LKO)
July 28, 2020 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge John M. Gerrard and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LKO)
July 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Albert Ramirez from Scotts Bluff County District Court, Case number CI 20-392 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4204960) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Todd R. McWha on behalf of Menard, Inc.(McWha, Todd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Menard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Ramirez
Represented By: Nathan J. Kinport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc.
Represented By: Todd R. McWha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Menard, Inc. a Nebraska Corporation doing business as Menards
Represented By: Todd R. McWha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?