Beran v. VSL North Platte Court LLC
Plaintiff: Katrina Beran
Defendant: VSL North Platte Court LLC
Case Number: 7:2021cv05003
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Brian C Buescher
Referring Judge: Cheryl R Zwart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROTECTIVE ORDER Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINAL PROGRESSION ORDER Depositions due 05/22/2022. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A status conference to discuss case progression, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on October 19, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Jennifer L. Turco Meyer on behalf of Plaintiff Katrina Beran. (Attachments: #1 Attachment to Rule 26F Report)(Turco Meyer, Jennifer)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER - The Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline is extended to May 3, 2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (JLK)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/26/2021. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LRM)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Vetter Senior Living for VSL North Platte Court LLC. by Attorney Colin J. Bernard on behalf of Defendants VSL North Platte Court LLC, Vetter Senior Living.(Bernard, Colin)
March 23, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to Notice of Removal Complaint regarding: Notice of Removal Attorney - Complaint, #1 by VSL North Platte Court LLC (Bernard, Colin)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant VSL North Platte Court LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Katrina Beran from District Court of Lincoln County, NE, Case number CI 20-730 with attached state court pleadings (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANEDC-4357908), by Attorney Colin J. Bernard on behalf of VSL North Platte Court LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Amended Complaint)(Bernard, Colin) Modified on 3/12/2021 to add receipt number(LRM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beran v. VSL North Platte Court LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VSL North Platte Court LLC
Represented By: Colin J. Bernard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Beran
Represented By: Jennifer L. Turco Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?