Conservflag Company, LLC v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Conservflag Company, LLC
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. and Allcat Claims Service, LLC
Case Number: 7:2024cv05004
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Presiding Judge: Susan M Bazis
Referring Judge: Michael D Nelson
2 Judge: Robert F Rossiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 GENERAL ORDER 2024-03 - Following Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis's appointment as a United States District Judge on April 10, 2024, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson as set forth in this order. Ordered by Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr.. (LKO)
April 10, 2024 Filing 21 ANSWER to Complaint by Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Murphy, Spencer)
April 10, 2024 Filing 20 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss #19 by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Allcat Claims Service, LLC.(Murphy, Spencer)
April 10, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Allcat Claims Service, LLC.(Murphy, Spencer)
March 27, 2024 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Jay S. Linton on behalf of Plaintiff Conservflag Company, LLC.(Linton, Jay)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Kendra A. Strommen is terminated as counsel of record. The Clerk of Court shall terminate future notices to her in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (LRH)
March 26, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re Kendra A. Strommen by Attorney Jay S. Linton on behalf of Plaintiff Conservflag Company, LLC.(Linton, Jay)
March 26, 2024 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Other Affiliate Claim Assist Solutions, LLC for Allcat Claims Service, LLC. by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of Defendants Allcat Claims Service, LLC, Claim Assist Solutions, LLC.(Murphy, Spencer)
March 21, 2024 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc..(Murphy, Spencer)
March 21, 2024 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company for Twin City Fire Insurance Company. by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of Defendants Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Fire Insurance Company.(Murphy, Spencer)
March 13, 2024 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Allcat Claims Service, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MLF)
March 11, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of Defendant Allcat Claims Service, LLC (Murphy, Spencer)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER: As per motion #8 Allcat Claims Service, LLC and Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond by 4/10/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
March 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. Twin City Fire Insurance Company shall answer or or otherwise respond by 4/10/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (RMW)
March 8, 2024 Filing 8 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of Defendants Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Twin City Fire Insurance Company.(Murphy, Spencer)
March 8, 2024 Filing 7 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Kendra A. Strommen has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 8, 2024 Filing 6 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Jay S. Linton has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (LRM)
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Plaintiff Conservflag Company, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 8, 2024 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 8, 2024 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(LRM)
March 8, 2024 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Robert F. Rossiter, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Conservflag Company, LLC from District Court of Cheyanne County, Nebraska, Case number CI 24-16 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5046492) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Spencer R. Murphy on behalf of The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Murphy, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conservflag Company, LLC v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conservflag Company, LLC
Represented By: Jay S. Linton
Represented By: Kendra A. Strommen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Spencer R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allcat Claims Service, LLC
Represented By: Spencer R. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?