AT&T Broadband v. Modern Electronics, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AT&T Broadband
Defendant: Steven Finn, Mark Abboud, April Silence, Arrow Technologies, Jacqueline Milliard, Modern Electronics and Brian Seidler
Garnishee: Werner Enterprises and Ice House
Interested Party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Case Number: 8:2002cv00430
Filed: September 16, 2002
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Bataillon
Referring Judge: Thomas D Thalken
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 553 Unauthorized reception of cable service
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2015 Filing 144 SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT regarding Judgment, #117 by AT&T Broadband by Attorney Jeffrey R. Platt on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband.(Platt, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2010 Filing 143 TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to General Order Number 2006-01, the is stricken for the following reason(s): document filed in incorrect case. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (TJD)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 142 STRICKEN TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: On the court's own motion, a Scheduling Conference is set for 9/9/2010 02:30 PM by telephone before Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. The court shall initiate the call.Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TJD ) Modified on 9/7/2010 to strike. (TJD ).
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER adopting in its entirety #140 Findings and Recommendation ; The referral of this case to the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska is withdrawn as set forth in the Report and Recommendation. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB, )
August 16, 2010 Filing 140 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - I respectfully recommend to the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska that it withdraw the reference of this adversary proceeding for all further proceedings as to the non-debtor defendants, while staying any proceedings as to Mr. Seidler. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) Ordered by U.S. Bankruptcy Judge Timothy J. Mahoney. (AOA)
August 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER pursuant to #137 Suggestion of Bankruptcy, this case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska. The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall deliver the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
August 5, 2010 Filing 138 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Anthony J. Siciliano at lawajspc@rcn.com regarding SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY #137 . E-mail NOT RESENT - unable to locate attorney. (ADB, )
August 5, 2010 Filing 137 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Attorney Katherine H. Owen on behalf of Defendant Brian Seidler.(Owen, Katherine)
July 2, 2007 TEXT ENTRY THAT PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS destroyed on 7/2/2007 by Clerk of Court. (CJP)
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY EXHIBITS SHOULD NOT BE DESTROYED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (CJP)
November 9, 2006 Filing 135 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment from Ice House (KBJ)
November 6, 2006 Filing 134 AFFIDAVIT of Heather Rogers by Attorney Jeffrey R. Platt on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Platt, Jeffrey)
November 6, 2006 Filing 133 AFFIDAVIT of Heather Rogers by Attorney Jeffrey R. Platt on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(Platt, Jeffrey)
November 3, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Application for an Order of Continuing Lien until 2/6/07. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
October 30, 2006 Filing 131 MOTION Application for an Order of Continuing Lien by Attorney Jeffrey R. Platt on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Instructions to Garnishee)(Platt, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2006 Filing 130 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Ice House on 10/24/2006. (Platt, Jeffrey)
October 30, 2006 Filing 129 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Werner Enterprises on 10/24/2006. (Platt, Jeffrey)
October 27, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER - The motion for withdrawal of counsel for the plaintiff #127 isgranted. The Clerk of Court shall stop all electronic notices to Michele E. Young regarding this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
October 26, 2006 Filing 127 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband(Young, Michele)
October 25, 2006 Filing 126 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment . (KBJ)
October 18, 2006 Filing 125 Summons Issued (COPY) and Order of Garnishment, with attachments, issued to garnishee Ice House. (KBJ)
October 18, 2006 Filing 123 Summons Issued and Order of Garnishment, with attachments, issued to garnishee, Werner Enterprises. (KBJ)
October 17, 2006 Filing 124 PRAECIPE AND AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHEE SUMMONS by Attorney Jeffrey R. Platt on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (KBJ)
October 17, 2006 Filing 122 PRAECIPE AND AFFIDAVIT FOR GARNISHEE SUMMONS by Attorney Jeffrey R. Platt on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband(KBJ)
August 18, 2005 Filing 121 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Jeffrey Platt regarding Notice of Docket Text Modification. E-mail Resent to jplatt@comananderso.com. THEIR SYSTEM WAS DOWN (KBJ)
August 18, 2005 Filing 120 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to Heather Rogers regarding Notice of Docket Text Modification. E-mail resent to hrogers@comananderson.com. THEIR SYSTEM WAS DOWN. (KBJ)
August 18, 2005 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification by Deputy Clerk regarding #119 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge Bataillon, held on January 9, 2004 regarding Permanent Injunction & Consent Decree. court reporter: Allan G. Kuhlman; Total Number of Billable Pages: 25. Total Number of Pages: 25. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Allan G. Kuhlman at 661-7305. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 5 business days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made electronically available without redaction. (AGK, ) Modified on 8/18/2005 by removing the word unredacted as a notice of intent to request redaction was not filed. (AST).
August 8, 2005 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings before Judge Bataillon, held on January 9, 2004 regarding Permanent Injunction & Consent Decree. court reporter: Allan G. Kuhlman; Total Number of Billable Pages: 25. Total Number of Pages: 25. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Allan G. Kuhlman at 661-7305. A party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 5 business days. If a party fails to request redaction, the unredacted transcript attached to this entry will be made electronically available without redaction. (AGK, ) Modified on 8/18/2005 by removing the word unredacted as a notice of intent to request redaction was not filed. (AST).
October 6, 2004 Filing 118 NOTICE of Change of Address for Plaintiff's Counsel by Attorney Jeffrey R. Platt on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Platt, Jeffrey)
September 23, 2004 Filing 117 JUDGMENT is entered in favor of plaintiff, AT&T Broadband and against defendants Arrow Technologies, Jacqueline Millard (individually) and Brian Seidler (individually, jointly and severally) in the amount of $34,564.48. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/23/2004. (MKR, )
September 23, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER that the Clerk's Office shall strike DocumentNumber #115 from the record. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/23/2004. (DKM, )
September 23, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 115 STRICKEN-JUDGMENT pursuant to the Order on Motion for Judgment[ 114] in favor of plaintiff, AT&T Broadband against defendants Arrow Technologies, Inc., Jacqueline Millard, individually and Brian Seidler, individually, jointly and severally, in the amount of $34,564.48. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/23/2004. (JAE, ) Modified on 9/23/2004; Stricken per Order #116 (DKM, ).
September 23, 2004 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Judgment; releasing Western Surety bond. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/23/2004. (SMS, )
January 9, 2004 Filing 113 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon Motion Hearing held on 1/9/2004; written order to be entered. (Court Reporter - Al Kuhlman) (ETC)
December 12, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER - the defendants' motion, #111 , to clarify is granted asexplained herein. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 12/12/2003. (TJS, )
December 10, 2003 Filing 111 Joint MOTION Clarification of this Court's 25 November 2003 Order by Attorney Anthony J. Siciliano on behalf of Defendant Jacqueline Milliard (Siciliano, Anthony)
December 8, 2003 Filing 110 MOTION for Judgment pursuant to Stipulated Order (filing 88) by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
November 25, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER denying #96 Motion for Return of Property; hearing on permanent injunction and disposition of case is scheduled for January 9, 2004, at 3:30 p.m., in Courtroom 3 (Omaha). Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 11/25/2003. (SMS, )
November 21, 2003 Filing 108 WITNESS LIST from hearing held On 11/21/03. (NCD, )
November 21, 2003 Filing 107 EXHIBIT LIST from hearing held on 11/21/03. (NCD, )
November 21, 2003 Filing 106 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon Motion Hearing held on 11/21/2003 regarding MOTION Return of Property (Emergency) #96 ; evidence by plaintiff and defendant; submitted; written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter - Allan G. Kuhlman) (NCD, )
October 29, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER rescheduling status hearing pursuant to #88 and hearing on #96 Motion for Return of Property to 11/21/2003 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom 3 (Omaha). Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 10/29/2003. (SMS, )
October 27, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #102 defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply Briefin support of #96 Motion for Return of Property; REPLY BRIEF #103 DEEMED FILED INSTANTER. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 10/27/2003. (SMS, )
October 24, 2003 Filing 103 BRIEF Defendants' Emergency Motion for the Return of Property Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Def. Emergency Motion for Return of Property by Attorney Anthony J. Siciliano on behalf of Defendant Modern Electronics (Siciliano, Anthony)
October 24, 2003 Filing 102 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Serve a Reply Memorandum of Law pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c) by Attorney Anthony J. Siciliano on behalf of Defendant Modern Electronics (Siciliano, Anthony)
October 23, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER scheduling for hearing on 11/13/2003 at 1:30 p.m., Courtroom 3 (Omaha), defendants' #96 Motion for Return of Property. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 10/23/2003. (SMS, )
October 20, 2003 Filing 100 INDEX in support of Brief #99 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Young, Michele)
October 20, 2003 Filing 99 BRIEF In Opposition to Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #96 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
October 3, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER regarding #97 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend time to respond to #96 Defendant's Motion for Return of Property. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 10/3/2003. (SMS, )
September 30, 2003 Filing 97 MOTION to Extend Time to file a response to Defendants' Emergency Motion for the Return of Property by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
September 29, 2003 Filing 96 MOTION Return of Property (Emergency) by Attorney Anthony J. Siciliano on behalf of Defendant Modern Electronics (Siciliano, Anthony)
September 11, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER continuing to 11/13/2003 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (Omaha) before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, the status hearing scheduled pursuant to Stipulated Order #88 . Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/11/2003. (SMS, )
July 29, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER that defendant April Silence is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Theremaining Defendants, Arrow Technologies, Inc., Jacqueline Milliard and Brian Seidler are still Defendantsto this action and are not dismissed. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 7/29/2003. (DKM, )
July 28, 2003 Filing 93 MOTION to Dismiss Party April Silence by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
July 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Modern Electronics, Inc., Mark Abboud and Steven Finn only, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. The remaining Defendants, April Silence, Arrow Technologies, Inc., Jacqueline Milliard and Brian Seidler are still Defendants to this action and are not dismissed. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 7/9/2003. (TJS, )
July 8, 2003 Filing 91 MOTION to Dismiss Party Modern Electronics, Mark Abboud and Steven Finn by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
June 9, 2003 Filing 90 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to lawajspc@aol.com regarding Order #88 . RESENT TO: lawajspc@rcn.com per request of attorney Anthony Siciliano. (JAE, )
June 9, 2003 Filing 89 Mail Returned as Undeliverable addressed to lawajspc@aol.com regarding Motion Hearing, #87 . RESENT TO: lawajspc@rcn.com per request of attorney Anthony Siciliano. (JAE, )
June 6, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATED ORDER resolving #56 Motion to Show Cause, #68 Motion to Dismiss, and #80 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement; setting out settlement terms and payment schedule which, if not adhered to, could result in a consent judgment against defendants for remaining balance plus additional 50% of balance; setting matter for hearing on 9/12/2003 at 8:30 a.m. if separate order of dismissal has not been entered by that date. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 6/6/2003. (SMS, )
June 6, 2003 Filing 87 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon Motion Hearing held on 6/6/2003 regarding MOTION Rule to Show Cause #56 , MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and for Entry of Judgment #80 The parties have represented to the court that they have reached a settlement. The parties will present a proposed order by the close of business 6/6/03. (Court Reporter - Allan G. Kuhlman) (NCD, )
May 16, 2003 Filing 86 CERTIFICATE of Serving Subpoena by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
May 15, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER setting for hearing on 6/6/2003 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 3 (Omaha) #56 Motion for Rule to Show Cause and #80 Motion for Rule to Show Causeto Enforce Settlement Agreement and for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 5/15/2003. (SMS, )
May 9, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #83 Motion to Extend; The parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositivestipulation) with the clerk of the court which will fully dispose of the case and provide a copyto the undersigned magistrate judge on or before August 5, 2003. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 5/9/2003. (DKM, )
May 6, 2003 Filing 83 MOTION to Extend Time for Submission of Stipulation to Dismiss by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
April 30, 2003 REPLY to Plaintiff's Motion to Enforce Settlment Agreement and for Entry of Judgment and Defendant's CROSS MOTION for Entry of Judgment #82 by Attorney Anthony J. Siciliano on behalf of Defendant Modern Electronics (NCD, ) Modified on 5/1/2003 to docket as a motion (NCD, ).
April 30, 2003 Filing 82 REPLY regarding MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and for Entry of Judgment #80 by Attorney Anthony J. Siciliano on behalf of Defendant Modern Electronics (Siciliano, Anthony)
April 22, 2003 Filing 81 INDEX In Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #80 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Platt)(Young, Michele)
April 22, 2003 Filing 80 MOTION to Enforce Settlement Agreement and for Entry of Judgment by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
April 3, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER the parties shall file a joint stipulation for dismissal witht he clerk and provide a copy to the undersigned magistrate judge on or before 5/5/03; absent compliance with this order, this case may be dismissed without further notice Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 5/5/2003. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 4/3/2003. (TJS, )
April 3, 2003 Filing 78 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney George Sutera has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TJS, )
April 3, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Compel; each defendant shall have to on or before 4/25/03 in which to fully respond without objection to the plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents and Things; defendants shall have to on or before 4/25/03 to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon them in accordance with FRCP37(a)(94)(A). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 4/3/2003. (TJS, )
March 21, 2003 Filing 76 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney George Sutera has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (TJS, )
March 21, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #34 Motion to Strike and #45 Motion to Strike as set forth; the plaintiff's motions to strike are gratned as to affirmative defenses 1,2 and 4 in the amended answers of defendants Arrow Technologies, Steven Finn, Jacqueline Millard and Modern Electronics [30-33] and the answers of the defendants Brian Seidler, April Silence and Mark Abboud [40-42]. The motions to strike are denied as to the remainder of the defendants' affirmative defenses. Affirmative defenses 1,2 and 4 are deemed striken. Granting #59 Motion for Leave to file a response to the plaintiff's motion to strike out of time. The court shall consider the defendants' response instanter; the defendants' request for leave to file amended answers is denied without prejudice Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 3/21/2003. (TJS, )
February 4, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER rescheduling hearing on #50 Motion to Release Funds and #56 Motion for Rule to Show Cause to 2/18/2003 at 1:00 p.m. in Courtroom No. 3 (Omaha). Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 2/4/2003. (SMS, )
February 4, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #72 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to file response to #68 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Count II. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 2/4/2003. (SMS, )
February 3, 2003 Filing 72 MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
January 31, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER rescheduling hearing on #50 Motion to Release Funds and #56 Motion for Rule to Show Cause; hearing scheduled for 2/6/2003 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 1/31/2003. (SMS, )
January 15, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER rescheduling hearing to 1/27/2003 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtoom 3 (Omaha), regarding #56 Motion for Rule to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 1/15/2003. (SMS, )
January 14, 2003 Filing 69 RESPONSE regarding Order, Terminate Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings #9 by Attorney Anthony J. Siciliano on behalf of Defendants Mark Abboud, Arrow Technologies, Steven Finn, Jacqueline Milliard, Modern Electronics, Brian Seidler, April Silence (Siciliano, Anthony)
January 13, 2003 Filing 68 MOTION to Dismiss Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Attorney Anthony J. Siciliano on behalf of Defendants Mark Abboud, Arrow Technologies, Steven Finn, Jacqueline Milliard, Modern Electronics, Brian Seidler, April Silence (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Siciliano, Anthony)
January 10, 2003 Filing 67 NOTICE of Service of Subpoena on John Hank by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
January 8, 2003 Filing 66 BRIEF In Opposition to Motion for Leave, #59 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
January 8, 2003 Filing 65 INDEX In Support of Motion to Compel #64 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit #5 Exhibit #6 Exhibit #7 Exhibit #8 Exhibit #9 Exhibit)(Young, Michele)
January 8, 2003 Filing 64 MOTION to Compel and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
January 7, 2003 Filing 63 ATTORNEY CM/ECF Registration Letter Regarding Defendants Mark Abboud, Arrow Technologies, Steven Finn, Jacqueline Milliard, Modern Electronics, Brian Seidler, April Silence ; letter sent to Attorney Anthony J. Siciliano with registration form. (TJS, )
January 7, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER setting for hearing on 1/16/2003 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom No. 3 (Omaha) plaintiff's #56 Motion for Rule to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 1/7/2003. (SMS, )
January 6, 2003 Filing 62 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Anthony J. Siciliano for Defendants Mark Abboud, Arrow Technologies, Steven Finn, Jacqueline Milliard, Modern Electronics, Brian Seidler, April Silence. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 1/6/2003. (TJS, )
January 6, 2003 Filing 61 Defendant's RESPONSE regarding MOTION to Strike Amended Answer to Complaint #30 , Amended Answer to Complaint #31 , Amended Answer to Complaint #32 , Amended Answer to Complaint #33 #34 by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendants Mark Abboud, Arrow Technologies, Steven Finn, Jacqueline Milliard, Modern Electronics, Brian Seidler, April Silence (TJS, )
January 6, 2003 Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses Out of Time by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendants Mark Abboud, Arrow Technologies, Steven Finn, Jacqueline Milliard, Modern Electronics, Brian Seidler, April Silence (TJS, )
January 6, 2003 Filing 58 INDEX In Support of Brief #57 in Support of Motion for Rule to Show Cause by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jeffrey Platt#2 Exhibit B - Acct. #676411#3 Exhibit A - Letter from Defense counsel#4 Exhibit C - Acct. #690594#5 Exhibit D - Acct. # 674093#6 Exhibit E - Acct. # 674739#7 Exhibit F - Cashier's Check#8 Exhibit G - Horizon Investments LLC)(Young, Michele)
January 6, 2003 Filing 57 BRIEF In Support of Motion for Miscellaneous Relief #56 for Rule to Show Cause by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
January 6, 2003 Filing 56 MOTION Rule to Show Cause by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
January 2, 2003 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER setting for hearing #50 Motion to Release Funds; hearing scheduled for 1/16/2003 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom No. 3 (Omaha) before Judge Joseph Bataillon. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 1/2/2003. (SMS, )
December 26, 2002 Filing 54 INDEX Opposition Response #53 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Exhibit #3 Exhibit #4 Exhibit)(Young, Michele)
December 26, 2002 Filing 53 RESPONSE regarding MOTION To Release Funds #50 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
December 23, 2002 Filing 52 DISCLOSURE Rule 26(a)(1)Disclosures by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
December 13, 2002 Filing 51 INDEX In Support of Motion To Release Funds #50 by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Jacqueline Milliard (TJS, )
December 13, 2002 Filing 50 MOTION To Release Funds by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Jacqueline Milliard (TJS, )
November 27, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE Planning Conference set for 4/3/2003 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 11/27/2002. (PAV, )
November 25, 2002 Filing 48 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
November 20, 2002 Filing 46 BRIEF In Support of Motion to Strike #45 affirmative defenses by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
November 20, 2002 Filing 45 MOTION to Strike Answer to Complaint #42 , Answer to Complaint #40 , Answer to Complaint #41 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
November 19, 2002 Filing 47 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Brian Seidler on 11/13/2002. (CJB, )
November 18, 2002 Filing 44 AMENDED SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Mark Abboud on 11/14/2002. (TJS, )
November 18, 2002 Filing 43 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant April Silence. (TJS, )
November 13, 2002 Filing 42 ANSWER to Complaint by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Mark Abboud (TJS, )
November 13, 2002 Filing 41 ANSWER to Complaint by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant April Silence (TJS, )
November 13, 2002 Filing 40 ANSWER to Complaint by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Brian Seidler (TJS, )
November 12, 2002 Filing 39 Amended Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Mark Abboud, Brian Seidler, April Silence. (TJS, )
November 12, 2002 Filing 38 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Brian Seidler. (TJS, )
November 12, 2002 Filing 37 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant Mark Abboud. (TJS, )
November 12, 2002 Filing 36 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to defendant April Silence. (TJS, )
November 8, 2002 Filing 35 BRIEF In Support of Motion to Strike #34 Affirmative Defenses by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
November 8, 2002 Filing 34 MOTION to Strike Amended Answer to Complaint #30 , Amended Answer to Complaint #31 , Amended Answer to Complaint #32 , Amended Answer to Complaint #33 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Young, Michele)
October 31, 2002 Filing 33 AMENDED ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint #1 by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Modern Electronics. (JAE, )
October 31, 2002 Filing 32 AMENDED ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint #1 by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Jacqueline Millard. (JAE, )
October 31, 2002 Filing 31 AMENDED ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES Complaint #1 by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Steven Finn. (JAE, )
October 31, 2002 Filing 30 AMENDED ANSWER and AFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to Complaint #1 by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Arrow Technologies. (JAE, )
October 31, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 defendants' Motion to Amend their answers; the clerk shall file the amended answers included with the motion instanter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 10/31/2002. (JAE, )
October 31, 2002 Filing 28 MOTION to Amend Answers by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendants Arrow Technologies, Steven Finn, Jacqueline Milliard, Modern Electronics (JAE, )
October 29, 2002 Filing 27 SCHEDULING PACKET Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/25/2002. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 10/29/2002. (TJS, )
October 18, 2002 Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Modern Electronics (JSF)
October 18, 2002 Filing 25 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Steven Finn (JSF)
October 18, 2002 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Arrow Technologies (JSF)
October 18, 2002 Filing 23 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Attorney George Sutera on behalf of Defendant Jacqueline Milliard (JSF)
October 17, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER regarding preliminary injunction hearing; asset freeze is continued; defendants to provide plaintiff with complete asset disclosure by 10/18/2002 at 5:00 p.m.; defendants to file answer no later than 10/18/2002. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 10/17/2002. (SMS, )
October 15, 2002 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon : Motion for Preliminary Injunction Hearing held on 10/15/2002 Contempt Hearing set for 11/15/2002 10:30 AM before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon; written order forthcoming. (Court Reporter - Allan G. Kuhlman) (NCD, )
September 27, 2002 Filing 20 ATTORNEY Registration Letter Regarding Plaintiff AT&T Broadband ; letter sent to Attorney Jeffrey R. Platt with registration form. (TJS, )
September 27, 2002 Filing 19 ATTORNEY Registration Letter sent to Attorney George Sutera with registration form. (TJS, )
September 26, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion TO UNSEAL CASE Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/26/2002. (TJS, )
September 25, 2002 Filing 17 STIPULATED MOTION to Continue Hearing and Extend TRO by Attorney George Sutera, Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband, Defendants Arrow Technologies, Modern Electronics (TJS, )
September 25, 2002 Filing 16 MOTION TO UNSEAL court file by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (TJS, )
September 24, 2002 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Arrow Technologies on 9/18/2002. (TJS, )
September 24, 2002 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Modern Electronics on 9/18/2002. (TJS, )
September 18, 2002 Filing 13 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Mark Abboud, Arrow Technologies, Steven Finn, Jacqueline Milliard, Modern Electronics, Brian Seidler, April Silence. (TJS, )
September 18, 2002 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING BOND by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (TJS, )
September 17, 2002 Filing 11 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Jeffrey R. Platt for Plaintiff AT&T Broadband. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/17/2002. (TJS, )
September 17, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Seal Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/17/2002. (TJS, )
September 17, 2002 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER sustaining EX PARTE motion for temporary restaining order #4 Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 9/17/2002. (TJS, )
September 17, 2002 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph F. Bataillon : Motion Hearing on Temporary Restraining Order held on 9/17/2002; ORDERED: Motion sustanined, written order forthcoming (Court Reporter - Allan Kuhlman) (TJS, )
September 16, 2002 Filing 7 INDEX In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for TRO #4 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband; ATTACHMENTS MAINTAINED IN CLERK'S OFFICE(TJS, )
September 16, 2002 Filing 6 BRIEF In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Motion for TRO #4 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (Attachments: #1) CLICK ON DOCUMENT NUMBER TO VIEW ATTACHMENT(TJS, )
September 16, 2002 Filing 5 MOTION for Hearing regarding MOTION for Preliminary Injunction MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order #4 by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (TJS, )
September 16, 2002 Filing 4 EX PARTE MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (TJS, )
September 16, 2002 Filing 3 MOTION to Temporarily Seal Case by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of Plaintiff AT&T Broadband (TJS, )
September 16, 2002 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET (TJS, )
September 16, 2002 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mark Abboud, Arrow Technologies, Steven Finn, Jacqueline Milliard, Modern Electronics, April Silence 7 Summons(es) issued, with receipt number 812763, in the amount of $ 150;, by Attorney Michele E. Young on behalf of AT&T Broadband (TJS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AT&T Broadband v. Modern Electronics, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AT&T Broadband
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Platt
Represented By: Mark E. Novotny
Represented By: Michele E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Finn
Represented By: Anthony J. Siciliano
Represented By: George A. Sutera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Abboud
Represented By: Anthony J. Siciliano
Represented By: George A. Sutera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: April Silence
Represented By: Anthony J. Siciliano
Represented By: George A. Sutera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Technologies
Represented By: Anthony J. Siciliano
Represented By: George A. Sutera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacqueline Milliard
Represented By: Anthony J. Siciliano
Represented By: George A. Sutera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Modern Electronics
Represented By: Anthony J. Siciliano
Represented By: George A. Sutera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Seidler
Represented By: Anthony J. Siciliano
Represented By: George A. Sutera
Represented By: Katherine H. Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Werner Enterprises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Ice House
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Bankruptcy Court
Represented By: U.S. Bankruptcy Clerk - Omaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?