Champion v. University of Nebraska Medical Center et al
Case Number: 8:2005cv00204
Filed: May 4, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - All pending motions are denied: filings 103 , 104 , 105 , 107 and 108 . Any future filing proposed to be filed in this matter by Plaintiff shall be referred to the Supervising Pro Se Judge, Richard G. Kopf, or his success or, for review before filing, and the Clerk of the court is directed not to file any such pleading until this review has been completed. The Supervising Pro Se Judge shall review any such tendered filing and if it fails to comply with this Memorandum and Order and applicable law it shall be returned to Plaintiff without filing. A record of any such submission and return shall be maintained by the Clerk in the CM/ECF system under the "PS" designation or as otherwise directed by the Supervising Pro Se Judge. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(GJG)
September 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that all pending Motions and Objections are denied. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAE)
December 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 88 Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 31 motion to reopen and clarify filing fee discrepancies. The court's order of dismissal 28 and Judgment 29 are withdrawn. By 8/31/07, the plaintiff shall either pay the court's $250 filing fee or fi le a new application to proceed IFP. This case is stayed until further order of the court. The clerk of court shall send the plaintiff a form Application to Proceed IFP and a copy of this Order. The clerk is directed to reopen this case. The clerk is further directed to set a pro se case management deadline using the following text: August 31, 2007: deadline for payment of filing fee or filing of IFP application. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Copies mailed as directed. (JSF)
May 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Amend and granting 6 the Motion for Leave to file and amended complaint; filing 6, which the court views as the First Amended and Restated Complaint is accepted for filing instanter; and granting the plaintiff's Motion for Information 5 regarding service of process; a copy of the rule is attached to this roder for the plaintiff's consideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett on 5/11/2005. (MKR, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Champion v. University of Nebraska Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?