Home Instead v. Velez et al
Case Number: 8:2005cv00237
Filed: May 20, 2005
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - The motion to withdraw as counsel for the defendants by Connie G. Jolly, Jr. andCraig S. Hilliard Filing No. 35 is held in abeyance; The movants shall immediately serve the defendants with a copy of this orderand the motion under considerat ion herein, and file proof of such service with the Clerk of Court; The individual defendants, William P. Velez and Lynne A. Velez, shall have to on or before September 12, 2005, to respond to the motion to withdraw by filing a brief with the Clerk o f Court. If no response is received or if substitute counsel has entered an appearance by that date, the motion to withdraw will be granted. If the motion to withdraw is granted and substitute counsel has not entered an appearance, the individual def endants willbe considered proceeding pro se and counsel for the plaintiff may communicate with the individual defendants directly; The corporate defendant Billynne Properties, Inc. shall have to on or beforeSeptember 12, 2005, to have substitute coun sel enter an appearance or show cause whydefault should not be entered. If no substitute counsel appears, or if good cause is not shownby that date, the court will strike the answer of corporate defendant Billynne Properties, Inc.and enter default against it, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 8/11/2005. (TJS)
July 28, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that the parties are to meet and confer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and file a reportof their meeting on or before September 1, 2005. Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 9/1/2005. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken on 7/28/2005. (JAE, )
July 27, 2005 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that the report and recommendation, 21, is adopted in its entirety. The referral of this case to Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska iswithdrawn. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas Thalken for furtherprogression of the matter. Signed by Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on 7/27/2005. (JAE, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Home Instead v. Velez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?