Carter v. The Advisory Group, Inc.
Case Number: |
8:2006cv00603 |
Filed: |
September 21, 2006 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
Presiding Judge: |
F. A. Gossett |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 13, 2009 |
Filing
200
ORDER - The Plaintiff's Motion to Continue Examination of Judgment Debtor 199 is granted, in part, as follows: The examination of the judgment debtor scheduled for March 16, 2009, at 2:30 p.m. is cancelled; and Plaintiff shall file a Satisfact ion of Judgment upon completion of the terms of the Settlement Agreement, but no later than October 15, 2009, or in the event that the terms of the agreement are not completed, Plaintiff shall file a motion to re-schedule the examination of the judgment debtor on or before October 15, 2009. The Defendant's Motion for Protective Order 196 is denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KBJ)
|
December 31, 2008 |
Filing
193
ORDER that the Clerk of the Court is directed to disburse the funds to the Plaintiff and the Plaintiff's attorney at Kutak Rock LLP, The Omaha Building, 1650 Farnam Street, Omaha, Nebraska 68102-2186. The Plaintiff shall file a partial satisfact ion of judgment upon receipt of the funds. Interest on any unpaid amount of the judgment remaining after such funds are disbursed shall continue to accrue at the amount set in the Judgment 164 . Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy to Financial) (JSF)
|
December 23, 2008 |
Filing
192
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - the remaining issue in the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Payment of Funds into Court and to Compel the Examination of Judgment Debtor 167 is granted. The defendant, The Advisory Group, Inc., through its designated officer or member, shall appear before the undersigned to testify. Court staff will contact the parties' attorneys to schedule the hearing. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing
188
ORDER that the Court has been notified that the Clerk of the Court is in receipt of funds in this matter pursuant to the Court's Order of November 12, 2008 (Filing 183). The funds were received in the form of two checks, one in the amount of 36;450,000.00 and the other in the amount of $17,373.09. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: The Clerk of the Court is directed to disburse the funds to the Plaintiff and the Plaintiff's attorney at Kutak Rock LLP, The Omaha Building, 1650 Farnam S treet, Omaha, Nebraska 68102-2186; The Plaintiff shall file a partial satisfaction of judgment upon receipt of the funds; and Interest on any unpaid amount of the judgment remaining after such funds are disbursed shall continue to accrue at the amount set in the Judgment (Filing No. 164 ). Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (copy to Financial Specialist)(ADB, )
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing
181
ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Payment of Funds into Court and to Compel the Examination of Judgment Debtor 167 is granted, in part, and deferred, in part; Wells Fargo Bank is hereby ordered to turn over the funds held on behalf o f The Advisory Group in the amount of $89,780.84 to the Clerk of the Court, with such funds to be applied to partial satisfaction of the judgment entered against The Advisory Group in this action; The Plaintiff's request for oral argument i ncluded in his reply brief (Filing No. 173 ) is granted; Oral argument is scheduled on the matter of the Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Payment of Funds into Court and to Compel the Examination of Judgment Debtor (Filing No. 167 ) on the 12th da y of November, 2008, at 1:30 p.m., with arguments of the parties not to exceed a total of one hour; The Clerk of the Court shall provisionally strike the Praecipe for Writ of Execution (Filing No. 166 ); and Plaintiff is granted leave to re-file the Praecipe with a revised Writ of Execution. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (copy to Financial Specialist)(ADB, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?