Yanouskiy v. Eldorado Logistics System et al
Case Number: 8:2006cv00674
Filed: October 23, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2007 Filing 87 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the memorandum opinion entered herein this date 86 , Defendants' motion for summary judgment 72 is converted to a motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff's amended complaint is dismissed without prejudice; and Stoughton's motion for summary judgment 71 is denied as moot without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
October 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Court has no subject matter jurisdiction in this mater; therefore, the Court will grant defendants' motion to dismiss without prejudice. The court will not address the merits of Stoughton's summary judgment motion. The Court will deny as moot Stoughton's summary judgment motion, without prejudice. A Separate order will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion.Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
August 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 83 motion for leave; granting 84 motion for leave to file briefs. Briefs are deemed timely filed. Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
August 9, 2007 Filing 84 MOTION for Leave TO FILE DEFENDANTS' REPLY BRIEF by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer. (Attachments: # 1 Defendants' proposed Reply Brief)(Gealy, Stephen)
August 9, 2007 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave TO FILE REPLY BRIEF by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendant Stoughton Trailers. (Attachments: # 1 Stoughton's proposed Reply Brief)(Gealy, Stephen)
August 6, 2007 Filing 82 REPLY BRIEF In Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 72 by Attorney Andrew H. Pillersdorf on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Pillersdorf, Andrew)
August 6, 2007 Filing 81 REPLY BRIEF In Opposition to MOTION for Summary Judgment 71 by Attorney Andrew H. Pillersdorf on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy.(Pillersdorf, Andrew)
August 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER denying as moot 76 objection to plaintiff's motion to extend brief deadline. Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
July 31, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Extend. Plaintiffs shall have until 8/6/07 to reply to defendants' motions for summary judgment. Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
July 31, 2007 Filing 78 AFFIDAVIT of STEPHEN S. GEALY FOR INDEX OF EVIDENCE by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer.(Gealy, Stephen)
July 31, 2007 Filing 77 INDEX OF EVIDENCE IN SUPPORT OF OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEF DEADLINE by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer.(Gealy, Stephen)
July 31, 2007 Filing 76 OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND BRIEF DEADLINE by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer.(Gealy, Stephen)
July 30, 2007 Filing 75 MOTION to Extend Plaintiff's time to respond to Defendant's MOTION for Summary Judgment 71 , MOTION for Summary Judgment 72 by Attorney Andrew H. Pillersdorf on behalf of Defendants Thunder Transportation, Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer, Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy.(Pillersdorf, Andrew)
June 28, 2007 Filing 74 OBJECTION to Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendant Eldorado Logistics System.(Gealy, Stephen)
June 18, 2007 Filing 73 TEXT NOTICE OF FILING BRIEF AND INDEX ATTACHED TO MOTION and TEXT NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE regarding Motion for Summary Judgment 72 by Deputy Clerk. A Brief and Index shall be electronically filed as two separate documents using the brief event and the index event. The brief and index must identify the document to which it relates. Also, the attorney login does not match the s/signature on this document. This notice is for your information for future filings. (ADB)
June 15, 2007 Filing 72 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney Cynthia R. Lamm on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment# 2 Index of Evidence# 3 Copy-Plaintiff's Verified Complaint# 4 Copy-Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint# 5 Copy-Defendants' Answer to Second Amended Complaint)(Lamm, Cynthia)
June 12, 2007 Filing 71 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Attorney Cynthia R. Lamm on behalf of Defendant Stoughton Trailers. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Evidence# 2 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment# 3 Affidavit of Helen Pillon# 4 Affidavit of Robert Fleischacker with Exhibits# 5 Affidavit of Ed Knoblauch with Exhibits# 6 Exhibit Copy Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint# 7 Exhibit Copy Answer to Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint)(Lamm, Cynthia)
May 25, 2007 Filing 70 DISCLOSURE Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by Attorney Cynthia R. Lamm on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Death Certificate# 2 Exhibit Autopsy Report# 3 Exhibit Lease Agreement# 4 Exhibit Bill of Lading# 5 Exhibit Owner Operator Contract)(Lamm, Cynthia)
May 24, 2007 Filing 69 DISCLOSURE (Rule 26) by Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus on behalf of Defendant Thunder Transportation.(Rauterkus, Jerald)
May 24, 2007 Filing 68 DISCLOSURE (Rule 26) by Attorney Herbert J. Friedman on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Friedman, Herbert)
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER- that the parties shall exchange their initial Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures on or before May 25, 2007. The defendants shall file their summary judgment motions on or before June 15, 2007. Plaintiff shall have until July 30, 2007, to respond to said motions. A further planning conference will be scheduled at the time of the ruling on said motions for summary judgment. Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
May 7, 2007 Filing 66 NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Matthew V. Rusch on behalf of Defendant Thunder Transportation (Rusch, Matthew)
May 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2007 at 08:30 AM before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom.Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
April 26, 2007 Filing 64 ANSWER to Complaint (PLAINTIFF'S 2ND AMENDED) by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer(Gealy, Stephen)
April 26, 2007 Filing 63 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus on behalf of Defendant Thunder Transportation Amended Complaint 62 filed by Yuriy Yanouskiy (Rauterkus, Jerald)
April 16, 2007 Filing 62 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against Defendant all defendants, by Attorney Herbert J. Friedman on behalf of Yuriy Yanouskiy(Friedman, Herbert)
April 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave; plaintiff shall have until April 18, 2007, to file a second amended complaint. Amended Complaint due by 4/18/2007. Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom.(CJP)
April 10, 2007 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Attorney Herbert J. Friedman on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Friedman, Herbert)
April 9, 2007 Filing 59 BRIEF on Issue of Diversity Jurisdiction by Attorney Andrew H. Pillersdorf on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(Pillersdorf, Andrew)
April 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 55 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Thunder Transportation shall have until 4/27/2007 to answer or otherwise plead to plaintiff's amended complaint. Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
April 4, 2007 Filing 57 INDEX IN SUPPORT OF Brief 56 ON ISSUE OF JURISDICTION by Attorney Cynthia R. Lamm on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer.(Lamm, Cynthia)
April 4, 2007 Filing 56 BRIEF ON ISSUE OF JURISDICTION by Attorney Cynthia R. Lamm on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer.(Lamm, Cynthia)
April 3, 2007 Filing 55 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Attorney Jerald L. Rauterkus on behalf of Defendant Thunder Transportation.(Rauterkus, Jerald)
March 29, 2007 Filing 54 RETURN of service of Summons on March 20, 2007 upon Thunder Transportation Co. by Attorney Herbert J. Friedman on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy.(Friedman, Herbert)
March 28, 2007 Filing 53 TEXT ORDER granting 51 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System and Ravinder Singh Heer answer due 4/27/2007. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JSF)
March 27, 2007 Filing 52 BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer 51 by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer.(Gealy, Stephen)
March 27, 2007 Filing 51 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer.(Gealy, Stephen)
March 27, 2007 Filing 50 NOTICE of Appearance for Cynthia R. Lamm by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer (Gealy, Stephen)
March 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that these actions are consolidated for purposes of discovery. The amended complaint 46 filed by plaintiffs in 8:06CV674 is deemed properly filed. The parties shall have until 4/2/07 to submit briefs as to whether the Court has jurisdiction in 8:07CV95. A further planning conference in these matters will be held 4/30/07 at 8:30 a.m. The parties may participate by telephone. Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
March 16, 2007 Filing 48 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Thunder Transportation. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL, )
March 14, 2007 Filing 47 Summons Requested as to defendant Thunder Transportation regarding Amended Complaint 46 . (Friedman, Herbert)
March 14, 2007 Filing 46 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant all defendants, by Attorney Herbert J. Friedman on behalf of Yuriy Yanouskiy(Friedman, Herbert)
February 8, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 3/6/2007 at 08:30 AM before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom.Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
February 6, 2007 Filing 44 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting /Report of Parties Planning Conference by Attorney Herbert J. Friedman on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy(Friedman, Herbert)
January 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that the motion for substitution of attorneys 42 is granted. The law firm of Baylor, Evnen, Curtiss, Grimit & Witt, LLP, is substituted as attorneys for defendants. The law firm of Strongin, Rothman and Abrams, LLP, is no longer counsel for said defendants. Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR )
January 15, 2007 MOTION to Withdraw the law firm of STRONGIN, ROTHMAN and Attorney David Alexander Abrams by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer. This entry corrects filing 42 . (JAE, )
January 15, 2007 Filing 42 NOTICE SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEYS by Attorney Stephen S. Gealy on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer (Gealy, Stephen)
January 8, 2007 Filing 41 SCHEDULING PACKET - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/12/2007.Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
January 5, 2007 Filing 40 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Andrew H. Pillersdorf for Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JAR)
January 5, 2007 Filing 39 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Gary B. Pillersdorf for Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JAR)
January 3, 2007 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Attorney Herbert J. Friedman on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy (Friedman, Herbert)
October 24, 2006 Filing 37 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney David Alexander Abrams has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MKR )
October 24, 2006 Filing 36 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Julio C. Roman has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MKR )
October 24, 2006 Filing 35 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Andrew H. Pillersdorf has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MKR )
October 24, 2006 Filing 34 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Gary Pillersdorf has not registered for admittance to practice or registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER for the foregoing reasons, this court finds that it lacks personal jurisdiction over defendants. Transfer, is in the interest of justice. Action transferred to USDC-NE. Ordered by Judge Eric. N. Vitaliano on 10/19/06 (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 32 REPLY to response to MOTION to Dismiss 17 by Attorney David Alexander Abrams on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4)(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Motion for Extension of time to file response/reply; Applciation granted. Defendant's time to reply to plaintiff's opposition todefendants' motion to dismiss due on 9/1/06. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/18/06 (Endorsed on ECF doc # 30
October 23, 2006 Filing 30 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File response/reply to Plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss by Attorney David Alexander Abrams on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System and Ravinder Singh Heer(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER endorsed regarding 28 Motion for Extension of Time to file response/reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss. Application granted. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/8/06 Modified on 10/24/2006 to modify document(MKR ).
October 23, 2006 Filing 28 MOTION for Extension of Time to file response/reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 27 by Attorney David Alexander Abrams on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System and Ravinder Singh Heer(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 27 AFFIDAVIT of Andrew H. Pillersdorf in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jursidiction 17 by Attorney Andrew H. Pillersdorf on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7)(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 24 Motion for Extension of Time to file response/reply; Plaintiff's application for additional time to respond to the motion is granted. Plaintiff's papers are due 7/21/06 and defendant is granted additional time for a reply Plaintiff's application to consolidate should await disposition of the motion to dismiss. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 7/11/06 (Endorsed on ECF doc # 24 (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 25 LETTER in response to plaintiff June 30, 2006 letter requesting extension briefing schedule by Attorney David Alexander Abrams on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System and Ravinder Singh Heer(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to file response/reply by Attorney Gary Pillersdorf on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 6/5/06. (Endorsed on letter dated 6/2/06 from Andrew H. Pillersdorf) (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 Order by Attorney Gary Pillersdorf on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER: Defendants request the Court to so order the briefing dates as follows: Plaintiff's opposition papers due 6/5/06 and defendant's reply are due 6/19/06; Application granted. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/18/06; (Endorsed on letter dated 5/17/06 from David Abrams) (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to file response/reply re: First motion for Extension of time to file response/reply to plaintiff's opposition to defendants' motion to dismiss, See Order dated 8/8/06. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 8/8/06. THIS IS A TEXT ONLY ORDER. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ATTACHED TO THIS ENTRY. (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT (Letter to Judge Azrack; request to so-order updated briefing schedule) by Attorney David Alexander Abrams on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack: Conference held on 1/9/06. Counsel for parties present. Rulings: Plaintiff may serve limited discovery requests re jurisdictional issue only. To serve by 1/23/06. Briefing schedule adjusted to 30 days from when plaintiff receives defendants responses. (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss 17 by Attorney Gary Pillersdorf on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Attorney David Alexander Abrams on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9 # 10 # 11 # 12 # 13)(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER endorsed re: Letter 15 . application granted. Ordered by Judge Joan m. Azrack. (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 15 LETTER by Attorney David Alexander Abrams to Judge Joan M. Azrack regarding extension of briefing schedule re: defendants' motion to dismiss on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System and Ravinder Singh Heer.(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER endorsed re Letter 13 . Application granted. Ordered by Judge Joan m. Azrack. (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 13 LETTER from David Abrams to Judge Joan M. Azrack regarding extension of briefing schedule re defendants' motion to dismiss by Attorney David Alexander Abrams.(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joan M. Azrack: Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/12/05. counsel for parties present. Motion to dismiss set for 10/4/05, 11/18/05 and 12/2/05 (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 11 STIPULATION on Consent to Extend Time to Answer by Stoughton Trailers by Attorney David Alexander Abrams and Julio C. Roman on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System, Ravinder Singh Heer and Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 10 ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Attorney David Alexander Abrams on behalf of Defendants Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System and Ravinder Singh Heer, Amended Complaint 5 filed by Yuriy Yanouskiy, (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 9 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendant Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System and Ravinder Singh Heer.(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of David Lupton regarding Amended Complaint 5 by Attorney Julio C. Roman on Ravinder Singh Heer on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of David Lupton regarding Amended Complaint 5 by Attorney Gary Pillersdorf on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service the Amended Complaint by Attorney Gary Pillersdorf on behalf of Plaintiff Yuriy Yanouskiy (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Stoughton Trailers, Eldorado Logistics System and Ravinder Singh Heer by Attorney Julio C. Roman on behalf of Yuriy Yanouskiy(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/12/05 at 2:00 p.m. before Magistrate-Judge Joan M. Azrack. Ordered by Judge Joan M. Azrack on 5/17/05. (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Eldorado Logistics System and Ravinder Singh Heer in the amount of $ 250;Two Summons issued by Attorney Julio C. Roman on behalf of Yuriy Yanouskiy (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 2 Letter by Clerk to attorneys of record regarding transfer of case to USDC-Nebraska. (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Filing 1 Transmittal letter (not provided by USDC-NY) with docket sheet transferring case from the USDC-NY, Case Number 1:05cv2202-ENV-JMA. (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Summons Issued (COPY) as to defendants Eldorado Logistics System and Ravinder Singh Heer. (MKR )
October 23, 2006 Remark - Public This case was transferred from USDC-NY on 10/20/06 and received by this court on 10/23/06. (MKR )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yanouskiy v. Eldorado Logistics System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?