Denenberg v. Djordjevic
Plaintiff: Steven M. Denenberg
Defendant: Borko B. Djordjevic
Case Number: 8:2007cv00150
Filed: April 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 181 DISMISSAL ORDER regarding STIPULATION of Dismissal 180 . On January 15, 2012, the cross-plaintiff/plaintiff's cause of action against the cross-defendant/defendant is hereby dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, and with the parties to be responsible for their own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TEL)
September 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER - The defendant shall respond to the plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, Filing No. 158 , on or before the first day of trial. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed to pro se parties) (TEL)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting 156 Joint Oral Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference. Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
July 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER - The parties' Stipulation to Continue Trial Date (Filing No. 153 ) is adopted. Trial of this matter is re-scheduled to commence before Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon on October 3, 2011, for two days. The court will hold a Final Pretrial Conference with counsel on September 7, 2011, at 1:30 p.m. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER - The parties shall have to on or before May 31, 2011, to submit the final draft of the Order on Final Pretrial Conference. After receipt and review of the Order on Final Pretrial Conference, the court will schedule a telephone conference in order to set the matter for trial. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se parties) (AOA) Modified on 4/7/2011 to indicate who copies were mailed out to (AOA).
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting 136 Plaintiff's Request for Additional Time to Submit Order on Final Pretrial Conference. The parties have until 2/7/2011 to submit the final draft of the Order on Final Pretrial Conference. The plaintiff's Request for Addi tional Time to Submit Itemization of Fees 137 is granted. The plaintiff shall have until 2/7/2011 to file an itemization of fees. The plaintiff's Motion to Reschedule Trial 138 is granted. The trial previously scheduled is cancelled. Trial of this matter will be rescheduled upon receipt of the Order on Final Pretrial Conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (JSF)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the 113 Findings and Recommendation of the magistrate judge is adopted in its entirety. Mr. Djordjevics third-party complaint, Filing No. 59 , is dismissed as to Doctors Surgery Center, without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to amend the caption in this case by terminating Mr. Djordjevics third-party complaint against Doctors Surgery Center. Mr. Djordjevics answer, Filing No. 21 , is stricken and default is entered against him, with entry of default to be set aside, upon written notice, if Mr. Djordjevic cures his deficiencies prior to entry of default judgment. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 116 plaintiff's Motion to Compel. By 11/17/2010, Doctors Surgery Center shall provide responses to the plaintiff's 4/6/10, interrogatories, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 33, without objection, and a complete corporate disclo sure statement as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. By 11/17/2010, Doctors Surgery Center shall show cause why sanctions, including the award of attorneys fees under Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(b)(2)(C), should not be imposed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER overruling the objection to the Findings and Recommendation 107 . The findings and recommendation 106 is adopted as set forth herein.The Clerk of Court is ordered to mail a copy of this order to the plaintiff at his last known mailing address, to contact him to confirm that he is receiving all pleadings in this case, and to make a text entry accordingly. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed as directed) (JSF)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Borko B. Djordjevic shall have to on or before June 3, 2010, to show cause by filing a written explanation for his failure to comply with the courts March 1, 2010, order (Filing No. 100). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(ADB, )
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER adopting in its entirety 98 Findings and Recommendation; John Osaka is dismissed from this case without prejudice; and The Clerk of the Court is directed to amend the caption in this case by terminating John Osaka as a third party defendant. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (ADB, )
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER - The undersigned magistrate judge will conduct a telephone planning conference with counsel for all parties and Mr. Djordjevic on March 19, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. Central Standard Time (8:00 a.m. Pacific Standard Time and 4:00 p.m. Serbia time). Mr. Denenberg will initiate the telephone conference. At least two days prior to the conference, Mr. Djordjevic shall notify Mr. Denenberg of Mr. Djordjevics telephone number in Serbia. Failure to participate in the telephone conference may result in the entry of default or dismissal. Planning Conference set for 3/19/2010 at 10:00 AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
January 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE- Borko B. Djordjevic shall have to on or before February 12, 2010, to file proof of service on John Osaka or show cause why John Osaka should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Show Cause Deadline set for 2/12/2010. The p arties shall meet, confer and file a joint planning report in accordance with the requirement of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) no later than February 12, 2010. The court may impose sanctions on any party who fails to comply with this order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f).Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed) (MKR)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that the defendant's Motion for Extension of Time in Which to Serve Third Party Defendants 61 is granted; the defendant shall have to on or before July 24, 2009, to serve each of the third-party defendants with a summons and the Third-Party Complaint in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, and file proof of such service. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (CJP)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER - Mr. Faile's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel for the Defendant 50 is granted. The Clerk of Court shall stop any notice to Mr. Faile regarding this case. The defendant is now proceeding pro se and counsel for the plaintiff may communicate with the defendant directly. The Clerk of Court shall file the following documents as if they were filed on today's date using the specific event types listed as listed in this Order. The plaintiff shall have to on or before June 5 , 2009, to file a response to the defendant's Motion to Bring in Third-Party Defendants. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to Mr. Faile and to the defendant at the addresses noted in this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed as directed)(KBJ)
May 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER - Mr. Faile shall submit the forms required for his pro haec vice admission in this matter on or before May 20, 2009. In the alternative, Mr. Faile shall file a motion seeking leave to withdraw as counsel for the defendant. The motion shall s tate whether Mr. Faile has discussed the matter with Mr. Djordjevic, whether the motion is opposed, and a certificate for service on the defendant. Failure to comply with this order may result in the attorney's removal as counsel of record for the defendant. The court will retain the six original documents sent to it by Mr. Djordjevic until the status of Mr. Failes representation of the defendant is resolved. If Mr. Faile continues to represent the defendant, the documents will be forwa rded to the defendants counsel. alternatively, the court will file the documents as of the date the defendant again becomes pro se. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to Mr. Faile and to the defendant at the addresses noted in this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed as directed) (KBJ) . Modified on 5/8/2009 to attach the correct document to this entry. (KBJ).
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - The telephone planning conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is continued to April 17, 2009, at 2:30 p.m. Central Daylight Time. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephone conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies to pro se party) (KBJ)
March 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - A telephone conference will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on April 10, 2009, at 2:00 p.m. Central Standard Time for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to date and scheduling of the case to trial. Plaintiff&# 039;s counsel shall initiate the call. Mr. Faile shall submit the forms required for his pro haec vice admission in this matter forthwith. The Clerk of Court shall add Mr. Faile as counsel for the defendant as noted in this Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed as directed)(KBJ)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - The plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for Rule 26(f) Filing 37 is granted. The parties have until March 4, 2009, to file their report to the court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (KBJ)
January 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The stay in this case is lifed. The parties shall meet, confer and file a joint planning report in accordance with the requirement of Fed.R.Civ.P.26(f) no later than February 2, 2009. ( Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 2/2/2009.) The court may impose sanctions on any party who fails to comply with this order pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(f). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed) (MKR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denenberg v. Djordjevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borko B. Djordjevic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M. Denenberg
Represented By: Norman Denenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?