April 28, 2009 |
Filing
135
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - The parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice 134 is approved, and the relief requested therein is granted. The Complaint, Amended Complaint, and all claims in this action are dismissed with prejudice. The parties shall pay their own costs and attorneys' fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAE)
|
March 23, 2009 |
Filing
133
ORDER granting 132 Motion to Extend. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Defendants Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time (Filing 132) shallbe granted; and 2. The parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal and submit a draft order to District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov on or before April 30, 2009. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (PCV, )
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing
131
ORDER - 1. On or before April 17, 2009, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to District Judge Laurie Smith Camp, at smithcamp@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order that will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, then the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1), and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice; 2. Any motions currently pending are denied wit hout prejudice as moot; and3. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice in accordance with NECivR 68.1. ( Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 4/17/2009.) Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (PCV, )
|
March 5, 2009 |
Filing
130
ORDER regarding 124 Motion to Amend; granting 129 Motion to Extend and the Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendant's Motion 124 on or before March 20, 2009. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (PCV, )
|
February 17, 2009 |
Filing
127
ORDER regarding 124 Motion to Amend; the Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendant's Motion on or before March 6, 2009. granting 126 Motion to Extend Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (PCV, )
|
January 23, 2009 |
Filing
123
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT granting in part as follows: The Plaintiff City of Omaha is precluded from offering extrinsic or parol evidence of communications with Figg taking place on or before February 8,2002, in support of the Citys breach-of-contract claims;and the Motion is otherwise denied; 92 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part, as follows:The Court finds as a matter of law that Figg was negligent in its finalcalculation of estimates of the cost of cons truction of the pedestrian bridge;and the Motion is otherwise denied; 106 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 120 Motion to Continue Defendant Figg Bridge Engineers, Inc.s Motion for Continuance (Filing No.120) is gr anted in part, as follows: The oral argument scheduled for January 26, 2009, is cancelled, and the stayof discovery ordered on October 14, 2008 (Filing No. 104) is lifted;and the Motion is otherwise denied; and4. The parties will contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett forthe scheduling of a planning conference. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (PCV, )
|
December 30, 2008 |
Filing
118
ORDER granting 117 Motion to Extend Time to Reply to Defendant's Brief in Opposition to the Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 106 . The Plaintiff shall reply to the Defendant's response by filing its brief and index of evidence, if any, on or before January 8, 2009. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAE, )
|
November 6, 2008 |
Filing
110
ORDER granting 109 Motion to Extend Time; The Defendant shall respond to the Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment 106 by filing its brief and index of evidence, if any, on or before December 18, 2008; and the Defendant shall reply to the Plaintiffs Opposition to the DefendantsMotion for Summary Judgment by filing its brief and index of evidence, if any,on or before December 18, 2008. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (PCV, )
|
October 14, 2008 |
Filing
104
ORDER granting 102 Stipulation. Plaintiff shall file its motion for summary judgment no later than 10/29/2008. Discovery is stayed until the district court has ruled on all parties' motions for summary judgment. If necessary, the court will schedule a planning conference after all summary judgment motions are resolved. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
|
September 23, 2008 |
Filing
98
ORDER granting 97 Motion to Extend; the Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendant's pending Motion for Summary Judgment by filing its brief and index of evidence, if any, on or before October 29, 2008. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (PCV, )
|