May 20, 2009 |
Filing
371
ORDER denying 342 motion for judgment as a matter of law; denying 346 motion for new trial. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
|
March 17, 2009 |
Filing
334
ORDER - 1) Defendants motions are denied as moot. 2) Plaintiffs motions are denied. 3) The clerk shall enter judgment for the defendant onthe verdict of the jury, taxing costs to the plaintiffs.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (PCV, )
|
March 1, 2009 |
Filing
299
MEMORANDUM- The Court makes the following rulings on objections to Mr. Richard Troxel's deposition testimony as set forth in the order. To the extent there are objections not specifically addressed in this memorandum, the Court will rule on such objections at the time the testimony is presented to the jury.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
February 19, 2009 |
Filing
278
ORDER that Polyform's motion in limine to exclude all evidence and references to reexamination of the '419 patent 154 is denied without prejudice; Polyform's motion to exclude all evidence and references to any alleged Chinese prior art 158 is denied without prejudice. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
|
January 30, 2009 |
Filing
269
ORDER - 1) Airlites motion for leave to file a supplementalexpert report is denied. 2) Airlites emergency motion for a continuance of the trial date is denied. 3) Airlites motion for leave to amend the PretrialOrder to name Robert Martin, Jr. as a lay witness is granted. 4) Polyforms opposition to Airlites emergency motion for continuance of the trial date and amendment of the pretrial order is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (PCV, )
|
November 26, 2008 |
Filing
258
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 105 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 138 Motion for Leave; granting 141 Motion to Amend; granting 146 Motion for Leave. IT IS ORDERED: 1) Polyforms motion for summary judgment that claims1-3 of the 419 patent is infringed by defendants Fox Blocks isgranted. 2) Polyforms motion for summary judgment that defendant willfully infringed the 419 patent is denied. 3) Airlites motion for su mmary judgment is denied. 4) Polyforms motion for leave to file the declarationof Crandell is denied. 5) Airlites motion for leave to amend its evidenceindex is granted. 6) Airlites motion for leave to file the PTOs orderis granted. 7) The parties requests for a hearing are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (PCV, )
|
November 20, 2008 |
Filing
257
ORDER - granting in part and denying in part 149 Motion for Summary Judgment; IT IS ORDERED: 1) Airlites motion for summary judgment to dismissNudura for lack of standing is denied. 2) Airlites motion for partial summary judgment on Nuduras claim for money damages prior to the RestatedDistribution Agreement is granted. 3) Airlites motion for summary judgment on Polyforms claim for damages measured by lost profits is granted.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (PCV, )
|
October 22, 2008 |
Filing
252
ORDER, This matter is before the Court on the emergency motion for continuance of the trial date. The Court will approve and adopt the conditions as set forth in the motion. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: 1) A telephonic status conference is set for: Monday, November 10, 2008, at 2 p.m.2) Trial of this matter is tentatively rescheduled for: Tuesday, January 20, 2009, at 9 a.m. 3) The parties shall abide by the terms and conditionsset forth in the motion in that no additional motions, no furtherdi scovery or expert opinions will be disclosed or proffered, and the parties agree that the current final pretrial order will remain in effect until trial begins. ( Jury Trial set for 1/20/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5 - Omaha before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom., A telephonic status conference set for 11/10/2008 02:00 PM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (PCV, )
|
October 16, 2008 |
Filing
238
ORDER denying as moot 234 motion for leave to supplement the record for the Court's Markman determination; granting 236 stipulated motion to excuse the requirement that trial briefs be filed. The parties need not file additional trial briefs. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
|
October 15, 2008 |
Filing
237
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Court finds "panel" means a distinct and separate piece of construction material that is generally flat in shape, and "alternating" means a sequence of projections and recesses that is not interrupted by another structure. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE, )
|
September 23, 2008 |
Filing
188
ORDER, This Courts previous order scheduling a Markman hearing 187 is set aside. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: 1) The parties shall file any additional briefs on or before October 7, 2008. 2) The Markman hearing is rescheduled for: Thursday, October 9, 2008, at 1 p.m., Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ruling on all pending motions will be deferred until after said hearing.(In Court Hearing set for 10/9/2008 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 - Omaha before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom.) Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (PCV, )
|