Fortin et al v. United Food & Commercial Workers, Local 271
Plaintiff: |
Ignacio Figeroa, Teresa Fortin and Lorenzo Estrella |
Defendant: |
United Food & Commercial Workers, Local No. 271 |
Case Number: |
8:2007cv00405 |
Filed: |
October 11, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
County: |
Douglas |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas D. Thalken |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1343 Violation of Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 23, 2009 |
Filing
37
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Plaintiff Ignacio Figeroa's Letter, construed as a Motion for Voluntary Dismissal 36 is granted. Figeroa's claims are dismissed without prejudice. 2. The remaining Plaintiffs' claims are also dismissed with out prejudice because these Plaintiffs failed to prosecute this matter diligently and failed to comply with this courts orders. 3. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. 4. All other pending motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copies mailed to pro se parties)(PCV, )
|
May 28, 2009 |
Filing
35
ORDER - The parties have not submitted a proposed order on final pretrial conference as directed in the order of December 10, 2008 (filing no. 29 ). IT THEREFORE HEREBY IS ORDERED, 1. The pretrial conference that was set for June 2, 2009 is cancelle d. 2. The parties are given until June 28, 2009 to submit the proposed final pretrial conference order, in the absence of which this case will be subject to dismissal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(LKH)
|
December 10, 2008 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On the courts own motion and due to the reassignment of this matter to the pro se docket, the progression order in this case is modified as follows. Deposition and discovery deadline due January 15, 2009. The Final Pretrial C onference will be held before Magistrate Judge David L. Piester on June 2, 2009 at 9:00 a.m.. The trial date will be set by Magistrate Judge Piester at the time of the Final Pretrial Conference. The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se cas e management deadline in this case using the following text: Pretrial conference before Magistrate Judge Piester to be held on June 2, 2009. The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this Memorandum and Order to Magistrate Judge Piester. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: ( Pro Se Case Management Deadline set for 6/2/2009 Pretrial conference before Magistrate Judge Piester to be held on June 2, 2009.) Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party and as directed) (MKR)
|
September 3, 2008 |
Filing
27
ORDER - Jerome Okolo's motion to withdraw 22 is granted. The Clerk of Court shall discontinue any notice of this case to Mr. Okolo. The plaintiffs are hereby considered proceeding pro se and counsel for the defendant may communicate with the p laintiffs directly regarding this case. The Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to the pro se docket in accordance with General Order No. 2007-13. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to each of the plaintiffs at their last known a ddresses:Ignacio Figeroa, 1309 Logan, Norfolk, NE 68701; Teresa Fortin, 818 S. 8th Street, Norfolk, NE 68701; Lorenzo Estrella, 1309 Logan. Norfolk, NE 68701. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copy mailed to pro se parties as directed )(JAE, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?