Widtfeldt v. Nebraska, State of et al
Plaintiff: |
James Widtfeldt |
Defendant: |
Nebraska, State of, Thomas P. Herzog, Internal Revenue Service and United States of America |
Case Number: |
8:2008cv00065 |
Filed: |
February 8, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
County: |
Holt |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1346 Wrongful Death |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 26, 2009 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 39 Defendants Internal Revenus Service and United States of America's Motion to Dismiss. A separate Judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order; All other pending Motions are denied as moot. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
April 13, 2009 |
Filing
44
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 42 the Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
March 13, 2009 |
Filing
41
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 38 the Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
February 6, 2009 |
Filing
36
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 31 the Plaintiff's Motions for Reconsideration and 29 . Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(MKR)
|
December 18, 2008 |
Filing
27
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendant Thomas P. Herzogs Motion for Attorneys Fees (Filing No. 20 ) is denied; Plaintiffs Motion for Rehearing (Filing No. 26 ), construed as a Motion for Reconsideration, is denied; Plaintiffs Motions for Rehearing (Filin g Nos. 24 and 25 ) are denied asduplicative; Plaintiffs Motion for Alias Summons (Filing No. 23 ) is granted. The Clerk of the court shall issue four summons forms to Plaintiff as set forth in his Motion; Plaintiff shall have until January 23, 20 09 in which to complete service of process on Defendant Internal Revenue Service. In the event that Plaintiff fails to complete service of process by that date, this matter will be dismissed without further notice. No further extensions of time to co mplete service of process will be permitted; and The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this matter with the following text: January 23, 2009: check for service of process on IRS and dismiss if not completed. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copies mailed as directed)(MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?