December 16, 2009 |
Filing
101
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Plaintiff Thomas J. Kawa's Motion for Reinstatement of Case and to Reset Progression Order Deadlines 99 is denied. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KBJ)
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing
96
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The Defendants Motion to Strike Fourth Amended Complaint and Rule12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss 91 is granted in part and denied inpart, as follows: a. The Plaintiff Thomas J. Kawas Fourth Amended Complaint 84 is stricken; b. T he Plaintiff Thomas J. Kawas Third Amended Complaint wasnever filed, and, therefore, the Defendants Motion to Dismiss the Causes of Action in the Third Amended Complaint, for failure to state claims upon which relief can be granted, is denied as moot ; c. The Plaintiff Thomas J. Kawas Second Amended Complaint 45 is dismissed, due to Kawas failure to prosecute with reasonable diligence; 2. The Motion to Withdraw 95 filed by the Plaintiffs attorney, Matthew T. Knoblauch, is denied as moot; and 3. The Plaintiff Thomas J. Kawas claims are dismissed, without prejudice. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (PCV, )
|
September 2, 2009 |
Filing
94
PROTECTIVE ORDER, granting 93 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
|
July 21, 2009 |
Filing
83
ORDER granting 80 Motion to Extend deadline; granting 81 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint. Third Amended Complaint due by 7/31/2009. Adverse parties shall respond within the time allowed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
|
March 13, 2009 |
Filing
58
SCHEDULING ORDER. Counsel for the remaining parties shall meet and confer pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and file their planning report with the court no later than 4/15/2009. (Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 4/15/2009.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
|
February 5, 2009 |
Filing
54
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to File Out of Time 53 is granted. Plaintiff immediately will file the Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion toDismiss, without any change, as a separate filing; and Defendants may file any reply to the Plaintiff's brief, on or before February 11, 2009. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (KBJ)
|
November 17, 2008 |
Filing
44
ORDER granting 43 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint due by 11/25/2008. Defendants Biorn Corporation, HS Financial Group, LLC, Unifund CCR Partners, and Duane Strempke shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint within 14 days of service thereof. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
|
October 14, 2008 |
Filing
35
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant US Bancorp, Inc., d/b/a US Bank, N.A. (Filing No. 29 ) is granted; The Plaintiff's claims against US Bancorp, Inc., d/b/a US Bank, N.A., are dismissed, without prejudice; The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Duane Strempke (Filing No. 31 ) is granted in part and denied in part; The Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Biorn Corporation, HS Financial Group, LLC, and Unifund CCR Partners (Filing No. 33 ) is granted; The Pla intiffs Sixth Cause of Action based on Civil Conspiracy is dismissed, with respect to all parties, without prejudice; The Plaintiffs Fifth and Seventh Causes of Action, to the extent they purport to present claims against Defendants Biorn Corporation , HS Financial Group, LLC, and Unifund CCR Partners, are dismissed, without prejudice; Defendant Strempke will respond to the Amended Complaint, addressing the Fifth Cause of Action, on or before October 24, 2008; and Defendants Biorn Corporation, HS Financial Group, LLC, and Unifund CRPartners will respond to the Amended Complaint, addressing the First,Second, Third and Fourth Causes of Action, on or before October 24, 2008.Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ETC)
|
September 9, 2008 |
Filing
28
SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff is given until 9/25/2008 to obtain a Clerk's Entry of Default and file a motion for default judgment, or take other appropriate action to prosecute the case, as to defendants Duane Strempke and Unifund CCR Partners, LLC. Defendants U.S. Bancorp, Biorn Corporation, and HS Financial Group shall, no later than 9/15/2008, file their answers or responses to plaintiff's Amended Complaint (Doc. 18). Failure to do so may result in the court's entering default against a non-responding party. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
|