February 12, 2010 |
Filing
176
ORDER that the Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice 175 is adopted; this matter is hereby dismissed with prejudice, and each party shall bear their own fees and costs. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (CJP)
|
November 23, 2009 |
Filing
133
ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to continue the trial date 131 is granted as set forth below. Trial of this matter will commence at 8:30 a.m. on February 1, 2010 before the undersigned magistrate judge and a jury in Courtroom No. 7, Second Floor, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing
126
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken for final disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
|
September 25, 2009 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants Shea Degan, Daniel Conway, and John Does I-IV's motion for summary judgment 45 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this Order. Defendants Shea Degan and Daniel Conway's motion for summa ry judgment on the state tort claims 90 is granted, and those claims are dismissed with respect to Degan and Conway. Defendants Eugene J. Graves, Jr., and Daniel Graves's motion for summary judgment 53 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this Order. Defendants Eugene J. Graves, Jr., and Daniel Graves's motion for Rule 11 sanctions 57 is denied. Defendants' motions for enlargement/extension of time 77 , and 78 are granted and the briefs and index of ev idence, found at Filing Nos. 80 , 81 , 82 , and 83 are deemed filed instanter. Defendants Eugene J. Graves, Jr. and Daniel Graves's motion to leave the record open 84 is granted and the affidavit, found at Filing Nos. 88 and 89 , is deemed filed instanter. Defendants Eugene J. Graves, Jr. and Daniel Graves's motion to supplement the record 96 is denied. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
|
September 11, 2009 |
Filing
107
ORDER - The defendants' Motion for Extension 106 is granted. The parties shall have to on or before October 30, 2009, to complete depositions and file motions in limine. The Final Pretrial Conference with the undersigned magistrate judge is continued to November 4, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. in chambers, Suite 2271, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
|
July 22, 2009 |
Filing
94
ORDER granting 93 Motion to Extend. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff is hereby granted an extension of time to file a response to the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Shea Degan and Daniel P. Conway 90 and from the current due date of July 24, 2009 to and including August17, 2009. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (PCV, )
|
March 24, 2009 |
Filing
66
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for an extension of time 65 is granted. An extension of time to file a response to the Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions filed by Defendants Eugene J. Graves, Jr. and Daniel Graves 57 and the Stipulation of the parties agreeing to the entry of an Order granting Plaintiff an extension of time to respond to said motion from the current due date of March 27, 2009, to and including April 6, 2009. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
|
March 23, 2009 |
Filing
67
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for an extension of time to file a response to the Motion for Summary Judgment 64 is granted. A Response to Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 45 filed by Shea Degan, Daniel P. Conway and John Does I through I V, and the Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Eugene J. Graves, Jr. and Daniel Graves 53 from the current due dates of April 6, 2009 and April 1, 2009, respectively, to and including April 13, 2009. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
|
February 20, 2009 |
Filing
51
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' motion to dismiss 30 is granted as to the claim against all the sheriff defendants in their official capacity. Defendants' motion to dismiss 30 is granted as to the state law claims under Neb Rev. Stat. § 20-148; and Defendants' motion to dismiss 30 is denied in all other respects. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
|
February 11, 2009 |
Filing
49
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for an extension of time 48 is hereby granted regarding the time to file a response to the Motion for Summary Judgment 45 filed by Defendants Shea Degan, Daniel P. Conway and John Does I through IV from the current due date of February 23, 2009 to and including April 6, 2009. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
|
October 2, 2008 |
Filing
34
ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time 33 is hereby granted. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time of fourteen (14) days to file a response to the Motion Dismiss 30 filed by Defendants Shea Degan, Daniel P. Conway, et al. from the present due date of October 8, 2008 to and including October 22, 2008. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (KBJ)
|
September 29, 2008 |
Filing
32
ORDER - The parties shall report to the court in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) on or before October 10, 2008 or show cause why sanctions should not be imposed upon them. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
|