United States of America v. Roemer et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Howard S. Roemer, Darlene A. Roemer, Ag Services of America, Howard Roemer, Darlene Roemer, Michael J. Roemer, Krissa M. Roemer, Melissa Polinski, First State Bank and Trust Company, RABO Ag Services of America, RABO Ag Services of America, Inc., Cornerstone Bank, N. A., Michael D. Butterfield, Bruce D. Butterfield, Phillip S. Butterfield, Kathleen L. Drab and Lyle W. Butterfield
Case Number: 8:2008cv00265
Filed: June 26, 2008
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Real Property: Foreclosure Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Richard G Kopf
Referring Judge: David L Piester
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2009. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the plaintiff's motion for dismissal with prejudice (filing #44 ) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 41, IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned case is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay his, her or its own costs. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (LKH)
June 10, 2009 Filing 44 MOTION to Dismiss by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Homan, Robert)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's request that this foreclosure action be stayed until June 10, 2009, to determine whether settlement can be reached (filing #42 ). The request shall be granted. If such matter is not resolved by that date, Plaintiff shall provide the court a status update as to this action. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
May 11, 2009 Filing 42 STATUS REPORT by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Homan, Robert)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - This matter is before the court on Plaintiffs request that this foreclosure action be stayed until May 11, 2009, to determine whether settlement can be reached (filing #39 ). The request shall be granted. This matter is stayed until May 11, 2009. If such matter is not resolved by that date, Plaintiff shall provide the court a status update as to this action. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
April 24, 2009 Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss Claims and Parties by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Defendants Michael D. Butterfield, Bruce D. Butterfield, Phillip S. Butterfield, Kathleen L. Drab, Lyle W. Butterfield, Counter Claimants Michael D. Butterfield, Bruce D. Butterfield, Phillip S. Butterfield, Kathleen L. Drab, Lyle W. Butterfield.(Domina, David)
April 10, 2009 Filing 39 STATUS REPORT by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Homan, Robert)
April 3, 2009 Filing 38 DISCLAIMER by Attorney David H. Fisher on behalf of Defendant Ag Services of America.(Fisher, David)
March 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - Plaintiff's counsel has requested that Plaintiff be given until April 13, 2009, to submit a proposed judgment and decree of foreclosure to the court. Plaintiff's request shall be granted. Plaintiff shall have until April 13, 2009, to submit a proposed judgment and decree of foreclosure to the court or, alternatively, provide the court, by affidavit, with a status update as to the foreclosure action. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
March 2, 2009 Filing 36 NOTICE of Serving Discovery Requests by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Defendants Michael D. Butterfield, Bruce D. Butterfield, Phillip S. Butterfield, Kathleen L. Drab, Lyle W. Butterfield, Counter Claimants Michael D. Butterfield, Bruce D. Butterfield, Phillip S. Butterfield, Kathleen L. Drab, Lyle W. Butterfield (Domina, David)
November 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Motion to Stay Rule 26 Planning Conference Report. The requirement for filing the Rule 26 report is stayed pending entry of consent judgment, or until further order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (JAB)
November 20, 2008 Filing 34 MOTION to Stay Rule 26 Parties' Planning Conference Report #31 by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Homan, Robert)
November 13, 2008 Filing 33 INDEX in support of MOTION for Default Judgment against Howard S. Roemer a/k/a Howard Roemer, Darlene A. Roemer a/k/a Darlene Roemer, Michael J. Roemer, Krissa M. Roemer and Melissa Polinski #32 by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Declaration)(Homan, Robert)
November 13, 2008 Filing 32 MOTION for Default Judgment against Howard S. Roemer a/k/a Howard Roemer, Darlene A. Roemer a/k/a Darlene Roemer, Michael J. Roemer, Krissa M. Roemer and Melissa Polinski by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Homan, Robert)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 SCHEDULING PACKET Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/1/2008. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (CCB)
October 23, 2008 Filing 30 ANSWER to Complaint by Attorney Bradley D. Holtorf on behalf of Defendant First State Bank and Trust Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deed of Trust)(Holtorf, Bradley)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER regarding #28 Motion To File An Answer Out-of-time. IT IS ORDERED: The motion of The First State Bank & Trust Company of Fremont, Nebraska, to file answer out of time, filing no. #28 , is granted. The answer shall be filed forthwith. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Piester. (LKL)
September 19, 2008 Filing 28 MOTION of Defendant, First State Bank & Trust Company of Fremont, Nebraska, To File An Answer to the Complaint Out-of-time regarding Complaint, #1 by Attorney Bradley D. Holtorf on behalf of Defendant First State Bank and Trust Company.(Holtorf, Bradley)
September 10, 2008 Filing 27 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Cornerstone Bank, f/k/a Cornerstone Bank, N.A. by Attorney Jason D. Mielak on behalf of Counter Claimant Cornerstone Bank, N. A., Defendant Cornerstone Bank, N. A..(Mielak, Jason)
September 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default. Defendants, Howard S. Roemer a/k/a Howard Roemer; Darlene A. Roemer a/k/a Darlene Roemer; Michael J. Roemer; Krissa M. Roemer; Melissa Polinoski and First State Bank and Trust Company of Fremont, Nebraska, are in default of this action for failure to plead or otherwise defend as required by law, default is hereby entered against the said Defendants as provided by Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copy mailed to pro se parties)(JAB)
September 4, 2008 Filing 25 INDEX in support of MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Howard S. Roemer a/k/a Howard Roemer, Darlene A. Roemer a/k/a Darlene Roemer, Michael J. Roemer, Krissa M. Roemer, Melissa Polinoski and First State Bank and Trust Company of Fremont, Nebraska #24 by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Homan, Robert)
September 4, 2008 Filing 24 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default against Howard S. Roemer a/k/a Howard Roemer, Darlene A. Roemer a/k/a Darlene Roemer, Michael J. Roemer, Krissa M. Roemer, Melissa Polinoski and First State Bank and Trust Company of Fremont, Nebraska by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America.(Homan, Robert)
September 2, 2008 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent RABO Agrifinance, Inc. for Ag Services of America. by Attorney David H. Fisher on behalf of Defendants Ag Services of America, RABO Agrifinance, Inc..(Fisher, David)
August 29, 2008 Filing 22 RABO AGRIFINANCE, INC. REPLY to Counterclaim of Butterfield Interes and Cornerstone Bank by Attorney David H. Fisher on behalf of Defendant Ag Services of America. (Fisher, David)
August 29, 2008 Filing 21 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Ag Services of America. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(BMH, )
August 28, 2008 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint BY RABO AGRIFINANCE, INC. by Attorney David H. Fisher on behalf of Defendant Ag Services of America(Fisher, David)
August 28, 2008 Filing 19 REPLY to Counterclaim of Defendants Butterfield Interests and Defendant Cornerstone Bank by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of Plaintiff United States of America. (Homan, Robert)
August 26, 2008 Filing 18 Cornerstone Bank ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America by Attorney Jason D. Mielak on behalf of Defendant Cornerstone Bank, N. A., Plaintiff United States of America, Counter Defendant United States of America(Mielak, Jason)
August 22, 2008 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM of Butterfield Interests against United States of America by Attorney David A. Domina on behalf of Defendants Michael D. Butterfield, Bruce D. Butterfield, Phillip S. Butterfield, Kathleen L. Drab, Lyle W. Butterfield, Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion and Stipulation for Dismissal, #2 Exhibit Order, #3 Exhibit Amendment Plan of Reorganization)(Domina, David)
August 18, 2008 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Kathleen L. Butterfield f/k/a defendant Kathleen L. Drab. Waiver sent on 8/6/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 29, 2008 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Darlene A. Roemer. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 29, 2008 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Howard S. Roemer. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 17, 2008 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon Bruce D. Butterfield, Individually. Waiver sent on 06/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 17, 2008 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon as Personal Representative of the Douglas R. Butterfield Estate, defendant Bruce D. Butterfield. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 15, 2008 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Lyle W. Butterfield. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 15, 2008 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Krissa M. Roemer. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 15, 2008 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Michael J. Roemer. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 15, 2008 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Michael D. Butterfield. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 11, 2008 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Cornerstone Bank, N.A.. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 11, 2008 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Ag Services of America. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 11, 2008 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Phillip S. Butterfield. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 11, 2008 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant Melissa Polinski. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
July 11, 2008 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed upon defendant First State Bank and Trust Company. Waiver sent on 6/30/2008. (Homan, Robert)
June 26, 2008 Filing 2 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Richard G. Kopf and Magistrate Judge David L. Piester assigned. (TCL)
June 26, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First State Bank and Trust Company of Fremont, Nebraska, Ag Services of America, Cornerstone Bank, N.A., Michael D. Butterfield, Bruce D. Butterfield, Phillip S. Butterfield, Kathleen L. Drab, Lyle W. Butterfield, Howard S. Roemer, Darlene A. Roemer, Michael J. Roemer, Krissa M. Roemer, Melissa Polinski, by Attorney Robert L. Homan on behalf of United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A-I, #2 Exhibits J-O)(Homan, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Roemer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard S. Roemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene A. Roemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ag Services of America
Represented By: David H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Roemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darlene Roemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Roemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krissa M. Roemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Polinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First State Bank and Trust Company
Represented By: Bradley D. Holtorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RABO Ag Services of America
Represented By: David H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RABO Ag Services of America, Inc.
Represented By: David H. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Bank, N. A.
Represented By: Jason D. Mielak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael D. Butterfield
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce D. Butterfield
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip S. Butterfield
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen L. Drab
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyle W. Butterfield
Represented By: David A. Domina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Office of General Counsel USDA - Farm Service Agen
Represented By: Office of General Counsel USDA - Rural Development
Represented By: Robert L. Homan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?