Warner v. Ewing et al
Plaintiff: |
Olen Warner |
Defendant: |
Terry Ewing and Nebraska Department of Correctional Services |
Case Number: |
8:2008cv00386 |
Filed: |
August 25, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
Johnson |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Lyle E. Strom |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 26, 2009 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting 11 Motion to Dismiss. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this memorandum opinion. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL )
|
November 12, 2008 |
Filing
7
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's claims against defendant Nebraska Department of Correctional Services are dismissed. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Ewing in his individual capacity may proceed and service is now warranted as to tho se claims only.To obtain service of process on defendant Ewing, plaintiff must complete and return the summons form which the clerk of the court will provide. The clerk of the court shall send ONE (1) summons form and ONE (1) USM-285 form (for servic e on defendant Ewing in his individual capacity only) to plaintiff together with a copy of this Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff shall, as soon as possible, complete the forms and send the completed forms back to the clerk of the court. In the absence of the forms, service of process cannot occur. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case with the following text: "March 12, 2009: Check for completion of service of summons."Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(TCL)
|
October 24, 2008 |
Filing
6
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In forma pauperis (Filing No. 2 ) is granted. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $8.74 by November 24, 2008, unless an enlargement of time is granted in resp onse to a written motion. If the initial partial filing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case is subject to dismissal. The clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at plaintiff's institution. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: November 24, 2008: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current addres s at all times, and all parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and by the Court's Local Rules while this case is pending. Plaintiff shall review the "Notice Regarding Summons Forms" attached to this Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copies mailed as directed)(TCL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?