Coleman v. Bunjer et al
Plaintiff: |
Maurice L. Coleman, Sr. |
Defendant: |
Kimberly Bunjer, Douglas County Prosecutors Office, Omaha Police Dept, Arthur (Bobby) Brumfield, Julie A. Frank and Tim Burns |
Case Number: |
8:2008cv00528 |
Filed: |
December 3, 2008 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Pro Se Docket |
Presiding Judge: |
Laurie Smith Camp |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 26, 2009 |
Filing
10
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Complaint 1 is dismissed without prejudice to reassertion in accordance with this Memorandum and Order; and A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandumand Order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp.(Copy mailed to pro se party)(KBJ)
|
February 4, 2009 |
Filing
9
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $16.00 by March 5, 2009, unless an enlargement of time is granted in response to a written motion. If the initial partial fil ing fee is not received by the specified deadline, this case is subject to dismissal; After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs institution shall collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 19 15(b)(2), quoted above, and shall forward those installments to the court; The Clerk of the court is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiffs institution; The Clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: March 5, 2009: initial partial filing fee payment due; Plaintiff shall keep the court informed of his current address at all times, and all parties are bound by the Federal Rules of Civil Pro cedure and by the courts Local Rules while this case is pending; and Plaintiff shall review the Notice Regarding Summons Forms attached to this Order. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party and copy mailed to finance officer at Leavenworth Prison)(PCV, )
|
December 29, 2008 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff is directed to correct the above-listed technical defect in the Complaint on or before January 26, 2009. Failure to comply with this Memorandum and Order will result in dismissal of this matter without further notice . The Clerk of the court is directed to send to Plaintiff the Form AO240, Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit. ( Case Management Deadline set for 1/26/2009 - for Plaintiff to correct technical defect in Complaint.) Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party along with AO240)(JAE, )
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?