O'Brien et al v. Cessna Aircraft Company et al

Plaintiff: Patrick O'Brien, Marilyn O'Brien, Catherine L. O'Brien, Rachel O'Brien and Amy E. O'Brien
Defendant: Cessna Aircraft Company, Goodrich Aerospace Company, Suburban Air Services, Inc., Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp. and Textron, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2009cv00040
Filed: January 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: Airplane Office
County: Sarpy
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1442 Petition for Removal

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the objections 150 to the magistrate judge's findings and recommendation are overruled. The motion to remand for lack of jurisdiction 81 is granted. The request for attorney fees, costs and expenses is denied. Defen dant Cesna's motion to file supplemental authority 159 is denied. Plaintiffs' motion to respond 162 is denied as moot. The findings and recommendation of the magistrate judge 148 is adopted in its entirety. The Clerk of Court is instructed to remand this case to the District Court of Douglas County, Nebraska. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 STIPULATED ORDER as to use of depostions from other cases (filed 1/23/07, MDL 1721) Ordered by Magistrate Judge David J. Waxse. (ADB, )
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER regarding Conditional Remand Order of the UnitedStates Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation 79 , on or before May 7, 2010, plaintiffs shall file a reinstatement of the motion to remand previously filed in this district and supplement any legal authority previously filed. Defendants shall respond to plaintiffs filing on or before May 14, 2010. In accordance with Rule 7.6(g) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the parties shall forthwith stipulate or designate all necessary pleadings on the matter filed to enable the Clerk for the District of Kansas to comply with the order of remand. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
July 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MultiLitigation; Docket No. 1721; case is transferred to the USDC-District of Kansas. (KBJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Brien et al v. Cessna Aircraft Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick O'Brien
Represented By: Arthur A. Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn O'Brien
Represented By: Arthur A. Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine L. O'Brien
Represented By: Arthur A. Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel O'Brien
Represented By: Arthur A. Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy E. O'Brien
Represented By: Arthur A. Wolk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cessna Aircraft Company
Represented By: Heather S. Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Aerospace Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suburban Air Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pratt & Whitney Canada Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?