Lamb et al v. ITT Corporation
Plaintiff: |
Carolyn C Lamb, Edmund A Chester and Cynthia Chester |
Defendant: |
ITT Corporation |
Case Number: |
8:2009cv00095 |
Filed: |
March 13, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
Other Statutory Actions Office |
County: |
Douglas |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas D. Thalken |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity |
Jury Demanded By: |
28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 3, 2010 |
Filing
40
ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice regarding Stipulation for Dismissal 39 . The Court, having reviewed the parties' Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice (filing no. 39 ), and otherwise being fully advised in the premise, hereby dismisses the above-captioned matter with prejudice, each party to pay its own costs. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JAB)
|
August 10, 2010 |
Filing
38
ORDER - On or before September 3, 2010, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.gov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The telephone planning conference previously scheduled is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
|
April 15, 2010 |
Filing
34
AMENDED ORDER - The parties' Joint Motion to Extend Progression Deadlines 32 is granted. All deadlines contained in the Court's March 8, 2010, Initial Progression Order are extended by thirty (30) days, with the exception of the telephone planning conference, which conference will remain scheduled for August 16, 2010, at 9:30 a.m. Central Daylight Time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
|
January 26, 2010 |
Filing
23
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 14 Motion to Dismiss. The defendant shall file a responsive pleading within 14 days of the date of this order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JSF)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?