Farrell v. Schoemaker Featured Case

Plaintiff: Keyen Farrell
Defendant: Jeremy Schoemaker
Case Number: 8:2009cv00188
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2009 Remark - Public: This case has been dismissed pursuant to the filing of a Notice of Case Dismissal 11 . (CJP)
July 1, 2009 Filing 12 TEXT NOTICE OF INCORRECT EVENT used when filing the Notice (Other) 11 by Deputy Clerk. In the future, use the event notice of case dismissal.(CJP)
June 30, 2009 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by Attorney J. Scott Paul on behalf of Plaintiff Keyen Farrell (Paul, J.) Modified on 7/1/2009 to correct event type (CJP).
June 25, 2009 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Jeremy Schoemaker, by Attorney J. Scott Paul on behalf of Keyen Farrell (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Paul, J.)
June 12, 2009 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant Jeremy Schoemaker on 6/10/2009. (Paul, J.)
June 8, 2009 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant Jeremy Schoemaker. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL)
June 8, 2009 Filing 4 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon and Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett assigned. (TCL )
June 8, 2009 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT regarding Complaint 1 by Attorney J. Scott Paul on behalf of Plaintiff Keyen Farrell. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Paul, J.)
June 8, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to Jeremy Schoemaker regarding Complaint 1 . (Paul, J.)
June 8, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Jeremy Schoemaker ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 08670000000001524812), by Attorney J. Scott Paul on behalf of Keyen Farrell(Paul, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Farrell v. Schoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keyen Farrell
Represented By: Michaela A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Schoemaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?