Precision Industries, Inc. v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
Plaintiff: Precision Industries, Inc.
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2009cv00195
Filed: June 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER - The parties request for stay is granted. On or before February 4, 2011, the parties shall file a status report containing counsels position(s) concerning whether the stay should continue in effect or whether the stay should be lifted. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
December 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting 131 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 72 Motion to Compel; adopting 89 Stipulation. The defendant shall have until October 1, 2010, to supplement discovery responses. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 77 SECOND AMENDED ORDER FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE - This matter is before the court on the parties' Joint Motion to Amend the Progression Order 75 . The motion is granted, in part. The Final Pretrial conference is set before the undersigned magistrate judge on March 18, 2010 at 11:00am in chambers. Trial is set to commence, at the court's call, April 18, 2010, in Omaha, Nebraska, before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon and a jury. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER - The plaintiff's motion to compel 42 is granted. Tyson Foods, Inc. shall supplement its responses for Interrogatories Nos. 4 and 5 on or before May 7, 2010. ADMONITION Pursuant to NECivR 72.2 any appeal of this Order shall be filed w ith the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Order. Failure to timely appeal may constitute a waiver of any objection to the Order. The brief in support of any appeal shall be filed at the time of filing such appeal. Failure to file a brief in support of any appeal may be deemed an abandonment of the appeal. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KBJ)
December 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 34 Joint Stipulation for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (PCV, )
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 15 the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the plaintiff's first cause of action. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (MKR)
September 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to Extend; the deadline for filing a reply brief in support of its motion to dismiss is extended until and including October 2, 2009. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (CJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Industries, Inc. v. Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Foods, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Industries, Inc.
Represented By: James J. Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?