Haferland v. Munoz et al
Plaintiff: |
Dale Haferland |
Defendant: |
Juan Munoz, Karla Velasquez, Manue Corona and Cargill Meat Solutions Corp. |
Case Number: |
8:2009cv00247 |
Filed: |
July 22, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
County: |
Colfax |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas D. Thalken |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1938 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 16, 2011 |
Filing
81
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The parties' motion for court-approved settlement shall be filed on or before 7/8/2011. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (CRZ)
|
June 1, 2011 |
Filing
80
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before June 16, 2011, the parties shall submit to the court a proposed schedule for filing their motion to approve the parties' settlement. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (KBJ)
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing
30
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - On or before January 25, 2010: a. Plaintiffs' counsel shall file the English translation of the executed consent forms written in Spanish and already filed in this case, along with counsel's affidavit or declaration a ttesting to the accuracy of the English translation. b. As a separate restricted access filing, plaintiffs' counsel shall file a declaration or affidavit listing, by court filing number, the name and date of birth for those who have already file d consents in this case, along with the date when the consent was executed. The listing created and maintained by the Clerk in this action, Haferland et. al., v. Cargill, 8:09CV247, shall be separate from the listing created and maintained in the lead case, Martinez et. al, v. Cargill, 4:09CV3079. Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
|
December 30, 2009 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The above-captioned action is consolidated with Martinez, et al. v. Cargill Meat Solutions, Corp., Case No. 4:09cv3079 (D. Neb. 2009) for discovery, trial and all other purposes. The above-captioned action is hereby designated as the "Member Case". Ordered by Judge Richard G. Kopf. (JAB)
|
October 2, 2009 |
Filing
16
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney Roger K. Doolittle is to register for admittance to practice register for the System or show cause by written affidavit why he cannot comply with the rules of the court. Show Cause Deadline set for 10/16/2009. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (Copies mailed) (MKR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?