September 17, 2012 |
Filing
72
ORDER AND JUDGMENT - Pursuant to the memorandum opinion 71 entered herein this date, Plaintiffs' motion for attorney's fee and costs is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants shall pay plaintiffs' attorney fees and costs in the amount of $38,687.00. Plaintiffs' motion for prejudgment interest is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants shall pay $121.13 in prejudgment interest. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (AOA)
|
August 14, 2012 |
Filing
63
MEMORANDUM OPINION - The Court will enter summary judgment in favor of the Lobergs and will deny summary judgment to LINA. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
|
January 31, 2012 |
Filing
62
ORDER granting 59 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. The brief 60 in opposition to plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment is deemed restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
|
January 24, 2012 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting 56 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. Thebrief in support of defendants' motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 57 ) is deemed restricted pending further order of the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
|
December 2, 2011 |
Filing
52
ORDER granting 51 Motion to Seal. Defendants shall file the administrative record on remand under seal on or before December 9, 2011. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
|
December 1, 2011 |
Filing
50
ORDER - Briefs shall be filed on or before January 23, 2012. Reply briefs, if any, shall be filed on or before January 30, 2012, at which time the case will be deemed submitted, unless the parties advise the Court to the contrary. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TEL)
|
February 10, 2011 |
Filing
46
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion for Summary Judgment: The Lobergs' claim for accidental death benefits in connection with Wade Loberg's death is returned to LINA to evaluate under Wickman v. Northwester n Nat'l Ins. Co., 908 F.2d 1077 (1st Cir. 1990), whether Wade's death was accidental; and The motion is denied in all other respects; granting in part and denying in part 38 Motion for Summary Judgment: Count IV of the Amended Complaint i s dismissed with prejudice; and The motion is denied in all other respects. This action is stayed pending the outcome of review of the claim under the standards set forth above. The parties shall file a written status report on or before September 1, 2011, concerning the progress of the evaluation by LINA. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting 42 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. The brief in opposition to plaintiff's motion for summary judgment and in support of defendant's motion for summary judgment 43 shall remain restricted to opposing counsel and the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
|
September 27, 2010 |
Filing
41
ORDER granting 40 Motion for Leave to file restricted brief. The brief in support of its motion for summary judgment shall remain restricted to opposing counsel and the Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
|
August 19, 2010 |
Filing
33
ORDER that the parties shall file their cross-motions for summary judgment on or before September 24, 2010. Both parties shall file their briefs in opposition to the respective motions on or before October 25, 2010. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 21 Motion to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint by 5/17/2010. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to conduct full discovery 22 is granted in part and denied in part. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
|
March 16, 2010 |
Filing
17
ORDER that defendant shall file under seal, by March 19, 2010, the administrative record in this case; Plaintiff shall have until March 31, 2010, in which to file any additional motions, and defendant shall have rule time to respond. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
|
November 18, 2009 |
Filing
12
ORDER - The parties shall file a short brief on or before Wednesday, November 25, 2009, addressing the issue of whether the parties are entitled to conduct full discovery or whether discovery in this case is limited to compiling and reviewing the applicable plan documents and the administrative record.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
October 27, 2009 |
Filing
11
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2009 08:00 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
|