Soyulmaz v. Sbarro, Inc.
Plaintiff: Volkan Soyulmaz
Defendant: Sbarro, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2009cv00299
Filed: August 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER regarding Suggestion of Bankruptcy 44 . Pursuant to NEGenR 1.5(a), and 28 U.S.C. § 157, this matter is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. IT IS ORDERED: This case is referred to the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska; This case shall be terminated for statistical purposes by the Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska; and The Clerk of the Court for the District of Nebraska shall transmit the court file to the Clerk of the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TEL)
April 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: On or before April 15, 2011, counsel for the parties shall electronically file a "Response" to this order, showing cause why this case should not be referred to the Bankruptcy Court for the District of Nebraska under NEGenR 1.5(a)(1) and 28 U.S.C. § 157. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (TCL )
January 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Extend Deadlines. The deadline for filing motions for summary judgment is extended from February 1, 2011 to February 15, 2011. The discovery deadline is extended to January 28, 2011, as requested. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PROTECTIVE ORDER - granting 33 Joint Motion for Protective Order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Extend. Deadlines extended as requested. Jury Trial continued to 3/15/2011 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Pretrial Conference continued to 2/17/2011 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soyulmaz v. Sbarro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volkan Soyulmaz
Represented By: John C. Wieland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sbarro, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher E. Hoyme
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?