Burr v. Legrow et al
Plaintiff: Theodore Burr
Defendant: Chris Legrow and Matthew M Kuhse
Case Number: 8:2009cv00307
Filed: September 2, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 20 Stipulation for Dismissal. 1. In accordance with the parties Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, this matter isdismissed with prejudice. 2. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(PCV, )
December 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Theodore Burr is hereby considered proceeding pro se and counsel for the defendants may communicate with the plaintiff directly regarding this case. The Clerk of Court shall reassign this case to the pro se docket in accordance with General Order No. 2007-13. The Clerk of Court shall send a copy of this order to the plaintiff at his last known address. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken (Copy mailed to pro se party)(PCV, ) Modified on 12/15/2009 to correct judge(PCV, ).
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 Motion Enlargement of Time; A deadline for the planning report will be scheduled upon resolution of Mr. Jorgenson's motion to withdraw. Jeremy Jorgenson's 14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney is held in abeyance. Theodo re Burr shall have to on or before December 14, 2009, to respond to the motion to withdraw by filing a brief with the Clerk of Court. If no response is received or if substitute counsel has entered an appearance by that date, the motion to withdraw w ill be granted. If the motion to withdraw is granted and substitute counsel has not entered an appearance, Theodore Burr will be considered proceeding pro se. Moving counsel shall serve a copy of this order on his client and file a certificate of such service with the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burr v. Legrow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Legrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew M Kuhse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore Burr
Represented By: Jeremy C. Jorgenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?