January 31, 2011 |
Filing
252
ORDER - The motion to seal 250 is granted. The index of evidence (Filing No. 251) shall remain sealed pending further order of this Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
December 2, 2010 |
Filing
229
ORDER denying without prejudice motion for protective order 170 . Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JDR)
|
November 30, 2010 |
Filing
225
ORDER granting 223 Motion to Seal. The second amended complaint (Filing No. 222) shall remain sealed pending further order of this Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
November 18, 2010 |
Filing
203
ORDER - The stipulation of the parties 202 is approved and adopted. King Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., and King Pharmaceuticals, Inc., are dismissed without prejudice as defendants in this action. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a second amended complaint, on or before November 30, 2010, removing those parties from the action. King Pharmaceuticals Holdings, Inc., and King Pharmaceuticals, Inc.s motion to dismiss 187 is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
November 10, 2010 |
Filing
199
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: 1. Alpharma's second motion to compel (Filing No. 124 ) is granted in part and denied in part: a. Alpharma's motion to compel with respect to RFP Nos. 2, 3, 18, 30, 31, 32, 33, 34, 35, 36, 37, 44, 45, 46, 47, 61, 65, 66, 80, 81, 92,and 93 and with respect to RFA No. 52 is granted. Pennfield may redact formulation information related to is NADA products. Pennfield may designate all information produced from its regulatory file as Highly Confidential, pursuant to the protective order entered in the case (Filing No. 69 ). To the extent it has not already done so, Pennfield is ordered to produce all responsive documents to said requests on or before December 3, 2010; and b. Alpharma's motion to compel wit h respect to RFP Nos. 7 & 9 and with respect to RFA Nos. 78, 79, 80, and 81 is denied; and 2. Pursuant to the parties' agreement that Pennfield may supplement its expert reports regarding the issue of damages (See Pennfield's Designation of Expert Witnesses, Filing 183 , 7), Pennfield's motion to modify the amended final progression order per agreement of the parties (Filing No. 165 ) is granted. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL ) Modified on 11/10/2010 to change restriction (TCL ).
|
November 9, 2010 |
Filing
198
ORDER - The motion to seal 195 is granted. The brief in opposition to Alpharma Inc.s motion for protection from Pennfields request for access to its SalesLogix Database, plaintiffs index of evidence, and Exhibits #s 1-3 (Filing Nos. 196 and 197) shall remain sealed pending further order of thisCourt. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
November 2, 2010 |
Filing
185
ORDER - The motion to seal 182 is granted. The designation of expert witnesses (Filing No. l83) shall remain sealed pending further order of this Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing
181
ORDER - Pursuant to the issues discussed at the hearing held October 25, 2010. The Court withholds ruling on all pending motions. Pennfield Oil Company (Pennfield) will submit to the Court for in camera inspection by Monday, November 1, 2010, the following items listed in this Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing
179
ORDER - The motion to seal 172 is granted. The index (Filing Nos. l73, 174 and l75) shall remain sealed pending further order of this Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing
169
ORDER - The motion to seal 164 is granted. The documents shall remain sealed pending further order of this court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing
154
ORDER granting 150 Motion to Seal. The reply brief shall remain sealed pending further order of this Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
|
September 27, 2010 |
Filing
143
ORDER granting 140 Motion to Seal. The brief in opposition to Alpharma, Inc.'s second motion to compel, index of evidence, and Exhibits 1-6 shall be sealed pursuant to the protective order. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAE)
|
September 8, 2010 |
Filing
133
ORDER - The motion to seal brief and accompanying index of evidence 125 is granted. The documents shall remain sealed pending further order of this Court. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
September 2, 2010 |
Filing
118
ORDER - Plaintiff's motion 112 to file amended complaint and answer to counterclaim and add additional parties is granted. Plaintiff shall have until September 8, 2010, to file its amended complaint and answer to counterclaim and add additional parties. Defendant's motion 116 for leave to file amended answer and counterclaim is granted. Defendant Alpharma shall have until September 15, 2010, to file its amended answer and counterclaim. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JAB)
|
June 1, 2010 |
Filing
83
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -Pennfields motion to file a surreply brief (Filing No. 80 ) is granted; Alpharmas motion to compel (Filing No. 58 ) is granted in part and denied in part: (a) Alpharmas motion to compel with respect to Request Nos. 2 and 3 is denied without prejudice; (b) Alpharmas motion to compel with respect to Request Nos. 8, 26, 27, and 53-55 is denied; (c) Alpharmas motion to compel with respect to Request Nos. 4, 7, 9, 18, 44-47, 61, 63, 65, and 66 is granted. To the extent it has not already done so, Pennfield is ordered to produce all responsive documents to said requests on or before June 28, 2010; (d) To the extent Alpharma moves to compel the production of documents to other requests not specifically identified above, suc h request is denied at this time; (3) Alpharma is granted leave to serve ten interrogatories on Pennfield to obtain information regarding the application and approval process for Pennchlor, to the extent such information is relevant to whether Pennchlor100 is generic. Such interrogatories shall be served on or before June 14, 2010. Ordered by Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
|
May 3, 2010 |
Filing
72
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Alpharma's objection to notice on the ground of absence of a protective order 36 is denied; Pennfield's motion to compel 37 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth in this Order. Pennfield's motion to compel Alpharma to remove its objections and fully respond to Pennfield's request for admissions is denied as moot. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
April 15, 2010 |
Filing
57
ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for expedited hearing 54 is granted; said hearing is scheduled for: Monday, April 19, 2010, at 2 p.m. Courtroom No. 5, Roman L. Hruska United States Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (KBJ)
|
January 4, 2010 |
Filing
24
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 1/26/2010 08:00 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
|