Schaffart v. ONEOK, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gaye Lynn Schaffart
Defendant: ONEOK, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2009cv00367
Filed: October 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Lyle E. Strom
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER - The stipulation (Filing No. 149 in 8:09CV367; Filing No. 171 in 8:09CV368) is approved and adopted; the bonds filed with this Court at Filing No. 140 in 8:09CV367 and Filing No. 156 in 8:09CV368, should be released by the Clerk of Court to ONEOK, Inc.'s attorney of record. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00367-LES-FG3, 8:09-cv-00368-LES-FG3 Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (Copy given to Finance) (AOA)
December 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER AND JUDGMENT- Plaintiffs motion for a 25% attorneys fee award is denied. Judgment is entered for plaintiff in the amount of $254,856.39. Defendants prayer for costs and fees associated with opposing plaintiffs motion for attorneys fees is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - Counsel shall advise the Court on or before October 4, 2010, whether any additional briefs will be filed in support of their respective motions and shall further advise the Court whether the briefs filed in support of their respective summary judgment motions may be considered in any ruling on the motions for directed verdict. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00367-LES -FG3, 8:09-cv-00368-LES -FG3. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (GJG)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting plaintiffs' motion for extension of brief date ( 93 in 8:09CV367; 107 in 8:09CV368). All parties shall have until 10/4/2010 to file briefs supporting their respective positions on the motion for mistrial. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00367-LES-FG3, 8:09-cv-00368-LES-FG3. Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (JSF)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall file briefs supporting their respective positions on or before September 20, 2010. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00367-LES -FG3, 8:09-cv-00368-LES -FG3Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (TCL )
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting 41 the Motion in Limine in case 8:09-cv-00367-LES -FG3; granting 49 Motion in Limine in case 8:09-cv-00368-LES -FG3 as to Paragraphs 1, 3, 4 and 5. The motion is denied without prejudice as to Paragraph 2. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00367-LES -FG3, 8:09-cv-00368-LES -FG3Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (MKR)
April 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER, 1) Plaintiffs motions for leave to file an amendedcomplaint are denied as moot. 2) Plaintiffs supplemental motions to file an amended complaint are granted. The amended complaints shall be filed onor before April 19, 2010. ( Amended Complaint due by 4/19/2010.) Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00367-LES-FG3, 8:09-cv-00368-LES-FG3Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (PCV, )
March 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 23 Motion for Protective Order Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (PCV, )
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that this matter is before the Court after a planning conference with counsel. By agreement of counsel,IT IS ORDERED that these cases are consolidated for purposes of discovery and trial. Member Cases: 8:09-cv-00367-LES-FG3, 8:09-cv-00368-LES-FG3Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (ADB, )
December 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 12/17/2009 09:00 AM in Chambers before Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom.Ordered by Senior Judge Lyle E. Strom. (CJP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schaffart v. ONEOK, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gaye Lynn Schaffart
Represented By: Thomas F. Hoarty, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONEOK, Inc.
Represented By: Victor C. Padios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?