Mid-America Pipeline Company LLC v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: |
Mid-America Pipeline Company LLC |
Defendant: |
Dale D Wilson and Wilson Excavating, Inc. |
Case Number: |
8:2009cv00370 |
Filed: |
October 13, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nebraska |
Office: |
8 Omaha Office |
County: |
XX US, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Joseph F. Bataillon |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas D. Thalken |
Nature of Suit: |
Plaintiff |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 11, 2011 |
Filing
146
ORDER of Dismissal with Prejudice - The stipulation for dismissal 145 is hereby approved; Plaintiff Mid-America Pipeline Company, LLC's amended complaint and any causes of action against Defendants Wilson Excavating, Inc. and Dale D. Wilson are dismissed with prejudice, with the complete record waived, and with each party to pay their own Court costs and attorneys' fees. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (TEL)
|
July 11, 2011 |
Filing
144
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that: On or before August 11, 2011, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal (or other dispositive stipulation) and shall submit to Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon, at bataillon@ned.uscourts.g ov, a draft order which will fully dispose of the case. If the case is being dismissed, the stipulation shall comply with Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and shall state whether the dismissal is with or without prejudice. Absent compliance with this order, t his case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice. The trial previously scheduled is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. ***Set/Reset All Deadlines: (Dismissal Papers Deadline due by 8/11/2011) Jury Trial terminated. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TEL)
|
July 7, 2011 |
Filing
143
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER tentatively denying 129 Plainitff's Motion in Limine; denying as moot 132 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (SMS, )
|
June 3, 2011 |
Filing
114
ORDER granting filing 110 , Joint Stipulation and Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Deadlines set in filing 103 have been extended as set out in this order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
|
May 6, 2011 |
Filing
103
ORDER granting 102 Motion to Extend; Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/5/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (ADB, )
|
March 1, 2011 |
Filing
92
ORDER granting 83 Motion in Limine with respect to any of the defendants' representatives testifying about the necessity or reasonableness of any repair cost. Otherwise, the motion is denied without prejudice. The Final Pretrial Conference is set for 6/17/2011 at 2:00 p.m. in Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken's chambers. Trial is set for 7/18/11 in Omaha before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon and a jury. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (JSF)
|
November 18, 2010 |
Filing
62
ORDER denying 59 Motion to Continue a Decision on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Until Depositions Have Been Completed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing
50
ORDER granting 48 Motion to Compel. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
|
January 11, 2010 |
Filing
23
PROTECTIVE ORDER adopting 22 Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (BJC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?