Castonguay v. Douglas County Attorney Office
Plaintiff: Paul Castonguay, Sr.
Defendant: Douglas County Attorney Office
Case Number: 8:2009cv00392
Filed: October 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Pro Se Docket
Presiding Judge: Warren K. Urbom
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER- 1. the plaintiff's Motion to Bring Additional Complaints (filing no. 7 ) is denied; 2. the plaintiff's Motion to Amend (filing no. 10 ) is granted to the extent that the court liberally construes the Motion to Amend as an amended complaint; 3. this matter is dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2); 4. a separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The court now conducts an initial review of the Complaint. The plaintiff shall have until February 5, 2010, to amend his Complaint and clearly state a claim upon which relief may be granted against Douglas County, in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. In the event that the plaintiff files an amended complaint, the plaintiff shall restate the allegations of the current Complaint (filing no. 1 ), and any new allegations. Failure to consolidate all claims into one document may result in the abandonment of claims. ***Pro Se Case Management Deadlines: Check for amended complaint on February 8, 2010, and dismiss if none filed. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(JAB)
December 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee shall be collected and remitted, as funds exist, in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2). The clerk of the court shall serve a copy of thi s order on the appropriate financial officer for the plaintiff's current institution. The plaintiff shall continue to keep the court informed of his current address at all times while this case is pending, as failure to do so may result in dismissal of this matter. Ordered by Senior Judge Warren K. Urbom. (Copy mailed to pro se party nnd the Douglas County Corrections)(GJG, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castonguay v. Douglas County Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Castonguay, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas County Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?