Schoemaker v. Sullivan Featured Case
Case Number: 8:2009cv00441
Filed: December 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:504 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2010 Filing 44 REPORT on the determination of an action filed on 9/1/2010 regarding Copyright (original form mailed to the Office of Register/Commissioner with a copy of Judgment 43 ) (JAB)
September 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT - The parties' Joint Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice (Filing No. 42 ) is approved. This case is dismissed with prejudice. Each party will pay its own costs and attorney fees. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JAB)
September 1, 2010 Filing 42 Joint STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker.(Cooper, Patrick)
August 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TEXT ORDER granting 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. John A. Sharp is granted leave to withdraw as counsel for David Sullivan. The court will terminate future electronic notices to Mr. Sharp in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
August 4, 2010 Filing 40 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney John A. Sharp on behalf of Defendant David Sullivan.(Sharp, John)
August 4, 2010 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance and Request for Notice by Attorney Kenneth W. Hartman on behalf of Defendant David Sullivan (Hartman, Kenneth)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER - Upon notice of settlement given to the magistrate judge by Patrick Cooper, counsel for Plaintiff, IT IS ORDERED: 1. On or before September 3, 2010, the parties shall electronically file a joint stipulation for dismissal. 2. Absent compliance with this order, this case (including all counterclaims and the like) may be dismissed without further notice; and 3. The Rule 16 planning conference set for September 13, 2010, is cancelled upon the representation that this case is settled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (JAB)
June 29, 2010 Filing 37 RETURN of service of Subpoena on June 25, 2010 upon GOOGLE, Inc. by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker.(Cooper, Patrick)
June 25, 2010 Filing 36 NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker (Cooper, Patrick)
June 14, 2010 Filing 35 NOTICE of Service of discovery requests by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker (Cooper, Patrick)
June 14, 2010 Filing 34 NOTICE of Intention to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cooper, Patrick)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULE FOR INITIAL PROGRESSION OF A CIVIL CASE - Planning Conference set for 9/13/2010 at 9:30 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. Counsel for plaintiff(s) shall initiate the planning conference call to the court at 9:30 AM on 9/13/2010. Counsel shall notify the undersigned magistrate judge by joint or separate letters by 8/2/2010 addressing mediation requirements. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
June 10, 2010 Filing 32 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker, Defendant David Sullivan.(Cooper, Patrick)
May 24, 2010 Filing 31 ANSWER to Complaint 1 with with jury demand by Attorney John A. Sharp on behalf of Defendant David Sullivan(Sharp, John)
May 11, 2010 Filing 30 SCHEDULING PACKET Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 6/10/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form, # 2 Rule 26(f) Report Form) Ordered by Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett. (CLS, )
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 7 is denied. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (CJP)
March 22, 2010 Filing 28 RESPONSE regarding Reply Brief, 24 (Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Brief Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction) by Attorney John A. Sharp on behalf of Defendant David Sullivan.(Sharp, John)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 25 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Brief; and Defendant shall immediately file, as a separate docket entry, the brief attached to its motion. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
March 20, 2010 Filing 26 RESPONSE regarding MOTION for Leave To File Attached Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Brief 25 by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker.(Cooper, Patrick)
March 19, 2010 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave To File Attached Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Brief by Attorney John A. Sharp on behalf of Defendant David Sullivan. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply Brief)(Sharp, John)
February 26, 2010 Filing 19 SUPPLEMENT regarding Index 17 , MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 7 by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 6), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 7), # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Part 2), # 6 Exhibit 3 (Part 3))(Cooper, Patrick)
February 26, 2010 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT regarding Index 17 , MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 7 by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 3), # 3 Exhibit 1 (Part 4), # 4 Exhibit 1 (Part 5))(Cooper, Patrick)
February 26, 2010 Filing 17 INDEX in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 7 by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1))(Cooper, Patrick)
February 26, 2010 Filing 16 BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 7 by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Plaintiff Jeremy Schoemaker.(Cooper, Patrick)
February 12, 2010 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Amended) by Attorney John A. Sharp on behalf of Defendant David Sullivan.(Sharp, John)
February 10, 2010 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney John A. Sharp on behalf of Defendant David Sullivan.(Sharp, John)
February 8, 2010 Filing 13 TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant David Sullivan d/b/a Big Blue Dots, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(JAE)
February 5, 2010 Filing 12 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Grant D. Fairbairn for Defendant David Sullivan. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (KBJ)
February 5, 2010 Filing 11 ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Paul E. Thomas has not registered for the system. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (KBJ)
February 5, 2010 Filing 10 APPLICATION/ORDER admitting pro hac vice Attorney Paul E. Thomas for Defendant David Sullivan. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (Copies mailed as directed)(KBJ)
February 5, 2010 Filing 9 INDEX in support of Brief 8 , MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 7 by Attorney John A. Sharp on behalf of Defendant David Sullivan. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit (Declaration of David Sullivan), # 2 Exhibit A to Sullivan Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Sullivan Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Sullivan Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Sullivan Declaration)(Sharp, John)
February 5, 2010 Filing 8 BRIEF in support of MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 7 by Attorney John A. Sharp on behalf of Defendant David Sullivan.(Sharp, John)
February 5, 2010 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Attorney John A. Sharp on behalf of Defendant David Sullivan.(Sharp, John)
December 17, 2009 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant David Sullivan on 12/14/2009. (Cooper, Patrick)
December 10, 2009 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to defendant David Sullivan. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL )
December 10, 2009 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright (original form mailed to the Office of Register with copy of complaint 1 ) (ADB, )
December 8, 2009 Filing 3 TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Laurie Smith Camp and Magistrate Judge F. A. Gossett assigned. (TCL )
December 8, 2009 Filing 2 Summons Requested as to David Sullivan regarding Complaint 1 . (Cooper, Patrick)
December 8, 2009 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against David Sullivan ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0867-1667151), by Attorney Patrick S. Cooper on behalf of Jeremy Schoemaker (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Cooper, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoemaker v. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?