Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Progress Rail Services Corporation
Case Number: 8:2010cv00038
Filed: January 27, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER that the Court will address the 289 Motion in Limine filed by Defendant Progress Rail Services Corporation at the pre-trial meeting held in chambers on June 11, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. (see Filing No. 264 at 4); The Plaintiff's response, if any, to the Defendant's Motion is due at or before the time of the pre-trial meeting. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER that plaintiff's 272 Motion in Limine and 276 Motion in Limine are hereby consolidated; The Defendant's response to the Plaintiff's Motions in Limine (Filing Nos. 272 and 276) must be filed on or before 12:00 noon on Wednesday, June 5, 2013; and Plaintiff's reply, if any, will be due on or before 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, June 6, 2013. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER granting 275 Motion to Withdraw Rajendra Kanuru as Attorney. The Clerk of Court shall terminate Rajendra Kanuru's appearance as counsel for Progress Rail and shall terminate future notices to Rajendra Kanuru in this action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
May 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the 268 Objection to Order Denying Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment is overruled. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
May 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER denying 266 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Summary Judgment. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
May 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER RE: TRIAL PREPARATION (CIVIL JURY TRIAL). Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JB)
May 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 222 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 227 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 243 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 245 Motion in Limine; denying 248 Motion for Hearing. Ordered by Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (ADB)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting in part the Plaintiff's 215 Motion to Compel Depositions and Request for Sanction. Defendant shall make Howard Bush and Richard Hodges available for deposition within 30 days of this Order. Topics of inquiry during the deposition shall be limited to information related to the PowerPoint presentation discussed above. Plaintiff's request for sanctions is deemed withdrawn. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (MKR)
September 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 180 FIFTH AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 170 Motion to Continue. Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2013 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 6/11/2013 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Roman L. Hruska Federal Courthouse, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
July 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER that the 148 Motion to Compel Inspection of Premises is granted, subject to the execution of a confidentiality agreement and liability waivers on the part of those conducting the inspection. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ADB)
June 11, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 142 Joint Stipulation. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (JAB)
March 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 128 FOURTH AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 126 the Stipulated Motion to Continue Deadlines. The pretrial conference is set for 1/14/2013 at 10:00 A.M., in chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. A jury trial is set for the week of 2/19/2013 at 8:30 A.M., in Courtroom 2 of the Hruska U. S. Courthouse, before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
December 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting the 118 Stipulated Motion to Continue. Pretrial Conference set for 8/13/2012 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. A jury trial is set for the week of 9/18/2012 at 8:30 A.M., in Courtroom 2 of the Hruska U. S. Courthouse, before Chief Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
August 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 104 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 103 Stipulated Motion to Continue Deadlines. The final pretrial conference before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett is set for 6/11/2012 at 9:30 A.M., in chambers. A jury trial before the Honorable Laurie Smith Camp is set for the week of 7/17/2012 in Omaha, Nebraska. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE, granting 98 the Stipulated Motion to Continue. Pretrial Conference set for 4/9/2012 at 09:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. Jury Trial set for 5/15/2012 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Judge Laurie Smith Camp. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (ARL, )
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER denying 56 Motion to Compel, without prejudice. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 23 Motion to Amend. Amended Complaint due by 10/5/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (CLS, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Union Pacific Railroad Company v. Progress Rail Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?