BLB Aviation South Carolina, LLC v. Jet Linx Aviation Corporation et al
Case Number: 8:2010cv00042
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Joseph F. Bataillon
Presiding Judge: Thomas D. Thalken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER TO WITHDRAW EXHIBITS OR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY EXHIBITS SHOULD NOT BE DESTROYED. If counsel fail to withdraw these exhibits as directed or to show cause why the exhibits should not be destroyed, the clerk's office is directed to destroy the listed exhibits without further notice to the parties or order from the court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MBM)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 215 AMENDED JUDGMENT regarding Order 214 . Judgment is granted in favor of BLB and against Jet Linx for breach of contract in the amount of $141,400 for unpaid lease payments and in the amount of $22,553.17 for overpaid maintenance costs. J udgment is granted in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff on the plaintiff's remaining claims. Judgment is granted in favor of Jet Linx and against BLB for breach of contract in the amount of $158,014.98 for maintenance costs resulting from the oil loss incident. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (KMG) Modified on 9/17/2014 to reflect this is an amended judgment (KMG).
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: The parties shall file a memorandum in support of their position on or before July 7, 2014. The parties shall have to on or before July 15, 2014, in which to file a reply memorandum. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
September 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED: Judgment will be granted in favor of BLB and against Jet Linx for breach of contract in the amount of $141,400 for unpaid lease payments and in the amount of $22,553.17 for overpaid maintenance costs. Judgment will be granted in favor of the defendants and against the plaintiff on the plaintiff's remaining claims. Judgment will be granted in favor of Jet Linx and against BLB for breach of contract in the amount of $158,014.98 for maintenance costs resulting from the oil loss incident. The defendants' oral motion for judgment as a matter of law is denied. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TCL )
February 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER granting Request for Transcript 180 - Defendant and Counter Claimant, Jet Linx Aviation Corporation, et al., is ordered to pay to the Clerk of Court the amount of $2,000.00. Should the cost of the transcript exceed this amount, the requestor will be required to pay the difference. Likewise, should the cost of the transcript be less than $2,000.00 a refund check will be issued. Upon receipt of this fee, the Clerk is ordered to prepare a transcript of the bench trial held on February 6-8, 2012. A paper copy of the transcript shall be mailed to the requestor. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (E-mailed to Financial) (TEL)
February 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying without prejudice the defendants' Motions in Limine 131 , 133 , 134 , 135 , and 136 ; granting the defendant's Motion in Limine 132 ; and overruling the plaintiff's Objections to Evidence 150 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 124 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge - upon consent of parties, this case is transferred to Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken for final disposition. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (JAB)
June 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - The defendants' motion for summary judgment (Filing No. 87 ) is denied in part and granted in part in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. The plaintiff's claim for breach of fiduciary duty is dismissed; the motion for summary judgment is denied in all other respects. Ordered by Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. (GJG)
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 78 Amended Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The plaintiff shall have until March 24, 2011, to file the Second Amended Complaint. The defendants shall have until April 4, 2011, to file their answer and counterclaim. The plaintiff shall have until April 11, 2011, to respond the defendants' counterclaim. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 THIRD AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE- The parties Joint Motion for Extension of Time (Filing No. 93 ) is granted and the September 15, 2010, Second Amended Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of Case (Filing No . 57 ) is amended. Jury Trial set to commence, at the court's call, during the week of 9/19/2011 before the Honorable Joseph F. Bataillon. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2011 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (MKR)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING FINAL SCHEDULE FOR PROGRESSION OF CASE and granting 56 Motion to Extend. Jury Trial set for June 13, 2011, at 8:30 am in Courtroom 3, Federal Building, 111 South 18th Plaza, Omaha, NE before Chief Judge Joseph F. Bataillon. Pretrial Conference set for May 6, 2011, at 10:30 am in chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (TRL)
April 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE that Attorney John R. McGuire is to register for admittance to practice and register for the System. Show Cause Deadline set for 5/23/2010. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (GJG)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER, IT IS ORDERED: 1. The defendants shall have to on or before February 16, 2010, to file a pleading responsive to the plaintiffs complaint.2. A telephone conference with the undersigned magistrate judge will be heldon March 1, 2010, at 11:00 a.m . Central Daylight Time for the purpose of reviewing the preparation of the case to date and the scheduling of the case to trial. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call. (At the request of the parties, the conference may be held inchambers).( Telephone Conference set for 3/1/2010 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken.) Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas D. Thalken. (PCV, )
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT: The defts motion to dismiss or transfer is denied in part and granted in part, in that the motion to dismiss is denied, and the motion to transfer is granted, and this matter is transferred to the USDC for the District of Nebraska. All pending motions are dismissed, as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Ralph E. Tyson on 1/29/2010. (JDL, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/1/2010.]
November 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding 5 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Case filed by Jamie Walker, Jet Linx Aviation Corporation. IT IS RECOMMENDED that defendants' motion to dismiss or transfer should be DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PA RT, in that the motion to dismiss should be DENIED, and the motion to transfer be GRANTED, and this matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Nebraska. Objections to R&R due by 12/1/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Docia L Dalby on 11/16/09. (BP, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Middle on 2/1/2010.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BLB Aviation South Carolina, LLC v. Jet Linx Aviation Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?