Rural Media Group et al v. MCC Magazines, LLC
Case Number: 8:2010cv00043
Filed: February 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nebraska
Office: 8 Omaha Office
Presiding Judge: F. A. Gossett
Presiding Judge: Laurie Smith Camp
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT - The Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendation (Filing No. 37 ) are adopted in their entirety. This case is dismissed without prejudice under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) as well as NECivR 41.2. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (AOA)
March 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff shall, no later than April 8, 2011, electronically file a "Response" to this order, showing cause why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution pursuant to NECivR 41.2. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (Show Cause Deadline set for 4/8/2011) (TEL)
March 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER regarding Status Report filing 33 . The parties shall file a joint status report by March 15, 2011, with the following information: a) Whether or not the arbitration proceedings have been concluded; b) The outcome of the arbitration proceedings, if concluded; and c) Whether the case should now be dismissed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge F.A. Gossett. (GJG)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 7 Motion to Compel Arbitration and denying 15 Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction. Ordered by Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (JSF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nebraska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rural Media Group et al v. MCC Magazines, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?